EP2808660 - Housing for a weighing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIPOTEC GmbH Adam-Hoffmann-Straße 26 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2018/47] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Wipotec Wiege- und Positioniersysteme GmbH Adam-Hoffmann-Strasse 26 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulzki, Alexander Am halben Morgen 3 67705 Stelzenberg / DE | 02 /
Rübel, Andreas Hohlstraße 29a 67737 Olsbrücken / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Eder, Thomas Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [2018/48] |
Former [2014/49] | Eder, Thomas Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14401066.7 | 27.05.2014 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | DE201310105647 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013105647 | [2014/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808660 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/49] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2808660 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2808660 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/28 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G01G21/28 (EP,US);
G01G21/30 (US);
H05K5/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gehäuse für eine Wägevorrichtung | [2014/49] | English: | Housing for a weighing device | [2014/49] | French: | Boîtier pour un dispositif de pesage | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 12.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18199829.5 / EP3447457 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2014 | AL | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | AT | 27.05.2019 | IE | 27.05.2019 | LU | 27.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | FR | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.05.2014 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.05.2014 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.05.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2002107219 (ANRITSU CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-12; | [XI]JP2012013465 (SHINKO DENSHI KK) [X] 1 * abstract *[I] 2-12 | by applicant | EP2130007 |