EP2770274 - Stand for solar panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carlsen, Lennart Hajla Norrgard 590 21 Väderstad / SE | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Berglund, Erik Wilhelm Berglunds Patentbyrå AB Aspebråten 590 55 Sturefors / SE | Application number, filing date | 14445003.8 | 20.02.2014 | [2014/35] | Priority number, date | SE20130000144 | 24.02.2013 Original published format: SE 1300144 | [2014/35] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2770274 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2770274 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
F24S25/70 (EP);
F24S25/12 (EP,SE);
F24S25/20 (SE);
F24S25/632 (EP,SE);
F24S2025/6007 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP,SE);
Y02E10/50 (SE)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gestell für Solarpaneelen | [2014/35] | English: | Stand for solar panels | [2014/35] | French: | Support pour panneaux solaires | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 02.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2010027979 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5,9; | [X]JPH09235844 (SHIROKI CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2011290307 (WORKMAN ROBERT EMMETT [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1A, 1B, *; | [Y]US2012240490 (GANGEMI RONALD J [US]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0122] , [ 0123]; figures 17-19 *; | [Y]US2012023726 (BELLACICCO JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0030] , [ 0037] *; | [Y]ES1066823U (COENAL SOLAR S A [ES]) [Y] 9 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2007157963 (METTEN ERICH CHRISTIAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0029]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2011168160 (MARTINEZ MOLL VICTOR [ES], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-6 * |