Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.10.2017 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
05.02.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.05.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
28.01.2015 | Change - representative |