EP2848478 - Flow switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skoda Auto A.S. Tr. Václava Klementa 869 293 60 Mladá Boleslav / CZ | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bedrich, Stanislav Erbenova 726/58 CZ-29301 Mladá Bolesla / CZ | 02 /
Hrdlicka, Martin Palackého 430 CZ-29301 Mladá Bolesla / CZ | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 14466015.6 | 17.06.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | CZ20130000470 | 18.06.2013 Original published format: CZ 20130470 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2848478 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2848478 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60T5/00, F16D65/807, F16D65/827, F16D65/847, F16D65/00 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B60T5/00 (EP);
F16D65/005 (EP);
F16D65/807 (EP);
F16D65/827 (EP);
F16D65/847 (EP);
F16D2066/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flussumschalter | [2015/12] | English: | Flow switch | [2015/12] | French: | Commutateur de flux | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2269144 (MCLAREN CARS NV [AN]) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]JPH0665045U (NISSAN SHATAI CO, LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4420068 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102008039728 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figure - *; | [AD]DE102012209980 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4420068 | DE102012209980 |