EP2915170 - INSULATION ARRANGEMENT FOR A HIGH VOLTAGE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDER, Florian Ludwig-Erhard-Str. 10 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
LANG, Steffen Schnaid 48 91352 Hallerndorf / DE | 03 /
PREIBISCH, Michael Rudolf-Breitscheid-Str. 35 90762 Fürth / DE | [2015/37] | Application number, filing date | 14700140.8 | 03.01.2014 | [2015/37] | WO2014EP50039 | Priority number, date | DE201310201053 | 23.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013201053 | [2015/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014114472 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2915170 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2915170 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/02, H01B3/04, H02K3/30, H02K15/10 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
H01B3/02 (EP,US);
H02K3/30 (US);
H01B3/04 (EP,US);
H02K15/105 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/37] | H01B3/02, H01B3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLATIONSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE HOCHSPANNUNGSMASCHINE | [2015/37] | English: | INSULATION ARRANGEMENT FOR A HIGH VOLTAGE MACHINE | [2015/37] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ISOLATION POUR UNE MACHINE HAUTE TENSION | [2015/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 30.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2014 | AL | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | MT | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | IE | 03.01.2017 | LU | 03.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 30.11.2016 | |
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 30.11.2016 | |
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1727160 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [AD]US2007141324 (STEVENS GARY [GB], et al); | [A]WO2011138173 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP2520619 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | US2007141324 | EP1981150 | US7776392 |