EP2953740 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies, Limited 21 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2DY / GB | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMPION, Nicholas 90 Edgedale Road Sheffield S7 2BR / GB | 02 /
STEEPER, Michael 33 Owlthorpe Avenue Mosborough Sheffield S20 5JS / GB | 03 /
TAGGART, Thomas 32 Ranby Road Sheffield S11 7AJ / GB | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Metals Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Metals Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 14700834.6 | 10.01.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014EP50365 | Priority number, date | GB20130002281 | 08.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201302281 | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014121972 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953740 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/08, E04C3/06 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
B21B1/092 (EP,US);
B21B1/088 (GB);
B21B1/08 (EP,US);
E04C3/06 (EP,GB,US);
B21B2001/383 (EP,US);
B21B2015/0021 (EP,US);
B21B2205/02 (EP,US);
B21B2261/043 (EP,US);
B21B2261/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BALKENS | [2015/51] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A BEAM | [2015/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE POUTRE | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1427880 (FUJI IRON & STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * figures 2a,2b,6,7a,7b7c; claims 1-4 * [I] 9; | [XDI]JP2000343102 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [XD] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9; | [X]JPH04111901 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE1609905 (ZEHNLE GEB RISACHER D AGNIERES) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-2; claims 1-3 * |