EP2907144 - RESISTANCE COVERING FOR A D.C. INSULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Steffen Schnaid 48 91352 Hallerndorf / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 14700861.9 | 15.01.2014 | [2015/34] | WO2014EP50713 | Priority number, date | DE201310204706 | 18.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013204706 | [2015/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014146802 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907144 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/28, C08K3/22, H01B3/10, H01B3/46, C08K3/34, H01B3/00, H01B3/02, H01B3/04, // C08K3/04 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H01B3/10 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
H01B3/004 (EP,US);
H01B3/02 (EP,US);
H01B3/04 (EP,US);
H01B3/28 (EP,US);
H01B3/46 (EP,US);
C08K2201/016 (EP,US);
C08K3/041 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | H01B3/28, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, H01B3/10, H01B3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | WIDERSTANDSBELAG FÜR EIN GLEICHSTROMISOLIERSYSTEM | [2015/34] | English: | RESISTANCE COVERING FOR A D.C. INSULATION SYSTEM | [2015/34] | French: | REVÊTEMENT RÉSISTANT POUR UN SYSTÈME ISOLANT À COURANT CONTINU | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0708455 (DAETWYLER AG [CH]) [X] 1-7,13-15* page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 3; figure 2; examples 1-6 *; | [X]EP1052655 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,13 * examples 1-3; claims 1-8; table 1 *; | [X] - CUI W ET AL, "Improving thermal conductivity while retaining high electrical resistivity of epoxy composites by incorporating silica-coated multi-walled carbon nanotubes", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 49, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2010.09.047, ISSN 0008-6223, (20110201), pages 495 - 500, (20100929), XP027515344 [X] 1-6,13 * Experimental Part; page 495 - page 500 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2010.09.047 | Examination | DE2103282 | US2003102154 | US2004129449 | US2006145119 | US2006231201 | US2007026221 | EP1766636 | US2007141324 | US2008102266 | US2009038832 | US7898481 | US2012118612 | US2012145315 | JP2012246336 |