EP2945601 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MEROCYANINE AND A LIPOPHILIC BENZOTRIAZOLE UV-SCREENING AGENT AND/OR A BIS-RESORCINYL TRIAZINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUDOT, Angelina 6 rue Edmond Michelet F-94270 Le Kremlin Bicêtre / FR | 02 /
CANDAU, Didier 46 rue de la Martinière F-91570 Bièvres / FR | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | L'Oreal Service D.I.P.I. 9, rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | ||
Former [2015/48] | Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14700911.2 | 20.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014EP51009 | Priority number, date | FR20130050487 | 21.01.2013 Original published format: FR 1350487 | FR20130050481 | 21.01.2013 Original published format: FR 1350481 | US201361767339P | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767339 P | US201361767331P | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767331 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014111563 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2945601 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2945601 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/58, A61Q17/04, A61K8/49, A61Q19/08 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
A61K8/41 (EP);
A61K8/496 (EP);
A61K8/4966 (EP);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Extension states | BA | 21.08.2015 | ME | 21.08.2015 | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM MEROCYANIN UND EINEM LIPOPHILEN BENZOTRIAZOL-UV-ABSCHIRMUNGSMITTEL UND/ODER EINER BISRESORZINYL-TRIAZIN-VERBINDUNG | [2015/48] | English: | COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MEROCYANINE AND A LIPOPHILIC BENZOTRIAZOLE UV-SCREENING AGENT AND/OR A BIS-RESORCINYL TRIAZINE COMPOUND | [2015/48] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE COMPRENANT UNE MÉROCYANINE ET UN AGENT ANTI-UV À BASE DE BENZOTRIAZOLE ET/OU UN COMPOSÉ BIS-RÉSORCINYL TRIAZINE | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Request for further processing for: | 28.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2014 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | IE | 20.01.2019 | LU | 20.01.2019 | MT | 20.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2008090066 (CIBA HOLDING INC [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 13 - page 4, line 13 * * composés MC 09, MC 11, MC 15; page 8 - page 9 * * page 11 * * page 40; example 26.1 * * claims 1, 8, 12-17 *; | [I]WO2009027258 (CIBA HOLDING INC [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, lines 3-5, 21-24 * * page 2, lines 7-19 * * compounds MC-01-MC-03; page 9; table 1 * * page 12; table 2 * * combinations M1, M1A, M3-M9, M10A, M14-M17, M20, M22, M23;; table 4 * * examples B15-B17; claims 1, 2, 6, 8-11, 23 * * page 63, line 17 *; | [I]WO2011113718 (OREAL [FR], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, lines 25-36 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 26 * * page 27, lines 41-43 * * composés (bl), (bm), (bn), (bo), (bp), (bq);; claim 1 * * examples A, B *; | [XP]WO2013010590 (OREAL [FR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * composés 14, 25, 27, 28;; table A * * examples 3, 4, 5 * * claims 13, 15, 17-19 *; | [XP]WO2013011094 (OREAL [FR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * composés 14, 25, 27-34, 37-46;; table A * * examples 3, 4, 5 ** claims 14-17, 20-22 *; | [Y] - "Mixtures comprising Cinnamates, Benzotriazoles and Merocyanines", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20091112), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013135311 [Y] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3 * * table 1 * * examples 16-18 * | [Y] - "Process for producing 3-amino-2-cyclohexan-1-ylidene compounds", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20090429), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013131313 [Y] 1-15 * page 1 * * composés 1-1 à 1-6, 1-13, 1-14; pages 11-12 * | by applicant | US2463264 | US3220972 | US3697473 | FR2315991 | FR2326405 | US4077441 | FR2416008 | US4195999 | FR2440933 | US4316033 | US4328346 | US4340709 | EP0114607 | US4749643 | US4850517 | EP0392883 | WO9206778 | US5166355 | EP0518773 | WO9304665 | US5237071 | EP0660701 | EP0669323 | EP0708108 | EP0711778 | EP0711779 | EP0742003 | GB2303549 | US5624663 | EP0775698 | EP0832642 | EP0841341 | DE19726184 | EP0893119 | US5869030 | DE19746654 | DE19755649 | EP0967200 | WO0025370 | DE19855649 | EP1008586 | EP1027883 | US6225467 | EP1133980 | EP1133981 | EP1300137 | DE10162844 | WO2004006878 | WO2004085412 | WO2006035000 | WO2006034982 | WO2006034991 | WO2006035007 | WO2006034992 | WO2006034985 | WO2007068371 | WO2007071582 | WO2007071584 | WO2008090066 | EP1977730 | WO2008155059 | WO2009027258 | WO2009063392 | WO2011113718 | WO2013010590 | WO2013011094 | WO2013011480 | - IP COM JOURNAL N°000182396D | - "9", IP.COM JOURNAL, (2009), no. 5A, pages 29 - 30 | - BANGHAM; STANDISH; WATKINS, J. MOL. BIOL., (1965), vol. 13, page 238 | - B.L. DIFFEY, J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1989), vol. 40, pages 127 - 133 | WO2012EP64195 |