EP2947998 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRYING AND/OR ROASTING A FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler Barth GmbH Daimlerstr. 6 71691 Freiberg / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Bühler Barth GmbH Daimlerstr. 6 71691 Freiberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VETTER, Karsten Guardinistr. 136 DE-81375 München / DE | 02 /
LOHMÜLLER, Tobias Schumannstrasse 22 71688 Freiberg / DE | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/49] | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 14701525.9 | 24.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014EP51394 | Priority number, date | EP20130152759 | 25.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13152759 | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014114744 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2947998 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2947998 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23G1/06, A23N12/10 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
A23G1/002 (EP,US);
A23G1/06 (EP,US);
A23N12/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKNEN UND/ODER RÖSTEN EINES LEBENSMITTELS | [2015/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRYING AND/OR ROASTING A FOOD | [2015/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS AU SÉCHAGE ET/OU À LA TORRÉFACTION D'UN ALIMENT | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/49] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR SÉCHER ET/OU TORRÉFIER UN ALIMENT | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 26.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17160818.5 / EP3207806 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2014 | AL | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | MT | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.01.2014 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 24.01.2014 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4326114 (GERLING JOHN E, et al) [A] 9-15 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [XA]DE3436334 (NAGEMA VEB K [DD]) [X] 15 * figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 1-8,10-14; | [A]US2007267409 (GARD ROBERT G [US], et al) [A] 9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008089986 (SONG EUGENE [KR]) [A] 9-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE202008011577U (BEAR MUEHLEN & BEHAELTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 15 * paragraph [0024]; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-8,10-14; | [XI] - WIESLAWA KRYSIAK ET AL, "Factors Affecting the Color of Roasted Cocoa Bean", JOURNAL OF FOOD QUALITY, (20130110), vol. 36, no. 1, doi:10.1111/jfq.12009, ISSN 0146-9428, pages 21 - 31, XP055062977 [X] 1-3,5-8,10,14,15 * page 23, column l, line 9 - line 37; figure 1 * * Abstract; page 26, column l, line 1 - line 3 * [I] 4,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jfq.12009 | [A] - DEUBLEIN D, "Kakaobohnen-Röstung: Verfahren im Vergleich", ZUCKER- UND SUESSWAREN WIRTSCHAFT, BECKMANN, LEHRTE, DE, (19940101), vol. 47, no. 1/2, ISSN 0373-0204, pages 11 - 12,14, XP008118545 [A] 1-8,10-15 * the whole document * | [A] - GARCIA-ALAMILLA ET AL, "Moisture, acidity and temperature evolution during cacao drying", JOURNAL OF FOOD ENGINEERING, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, (20061115), vol. 79, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JFOODENG.2006.04.005, ISSN 0260-8774, pages 1159 - 1165, XP005728365 [A] 1-8,10-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2006.04.005 | by applicant | EP2273888 |