EP2941840 - SELECTIVELY PATCHING ERASURES IN CIRCUIT-SWITCHED CALLS WHOSE FRAME ERASURE RATE RISES ABOVE A THRESHOLD BY ESTABLISHING AND SYNCHRONIZING A VOIP STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/46] | SELECTIVELY PATCHING ERASURES IN CIRCIUT-SWITCHED CALLS WHOSE FRAME ERASURE RATE RISES ABOVE A THRESHOLD BY ESTABLISHING AND SYNCHRONIZING A VOIP STREAM | ||
[2016/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDNER, Mark 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/46] | Skrba, Sinéad, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14702107.5 | 03.01.2014 | [2015/46] | WO2014US10234 | Priority number, date | US201361748486P | 03.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361748486 P | US201414146449 | 02.01.2014 Original published format: US201414146449 | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014107612 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941840 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2941840 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/20, H04B7/02, H04L1/02, H04H20/20 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
H04B7/02 (EP);
H04L1/201 (US);
H04B7/0888 (EP,US);
H04H20/20 (EP,US);
H04L1/02 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE PATCHING-LÖSCHUNGEN IN LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN VERBINDUNGEN MIT EINER RAHMENLÖSCHUNGSRATE ÜBER EINEM SCHWELLENWERT DURCH EINRICHTUNG UND SYNCHRONISIERUNG EINES VOIP-DATENSTROMS | [2016/23] | English: | SELECTIVELY PATCHING ERASURES IN CIRCUIT-SWITCHED CALLS WHOSE FRAME ERASURE RATE RISES ABOVE A THRESHOLD BY ESTABLISHING AND SYNCHRONIZING A VOIP STREAM | [2016/25] | French: | RAPIÉÇAGE SÉLECTIF D'EFFACEMENTS D'APPELS À COMMUTATION DE CIRCUITS À VITESSE D'EFFACEMENT DE TRAME DÉPASSANT UN SEUIL PAR ÉTABLISSEMENT ET SYNCHRONISATION D'UN FLUX VOIP | [2016/23] |
Former [2015/46] | SELEKTIVE PATCHING-LÖSCHUNGEN IN LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN RUFEN MIT EINER RAHMENLÖSCHUNGSRATE ÜBER EINEM SCHWELLENWERT DURCH EINRICHTUNG UND SYNCHRONISIERUNG EINES VOIP-STROMS | ||
Former [2015/46] | SELECTIVELY PATCHING ERASURES IN CIRCIUT-SWITCHED CALLS WHOSE FRAME ERASURE RATE RISES ABOVE A THRESHOLD BY ESTABLISHING AND SYNCHRONIZING A VOIP STREAM | ||
Former [2015/46] | RAPIÉÇAGE SÉLECTIF D'EFFACEMENTS D'APPELS EN CIRCUIT COMMUTÉ À VITESSE D'EFFACEMENT DE TRAME DÉPASSANT UN SEUIL PAR ÉTABLISSEMENT ET SYNCHRONISATION D'UN FLUX VOIP | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2014 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | IE | 03.01.2017 | LU | 03.01.2017 | MT | 03.01.2017 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.01.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5592471 (BRISKMAN ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,15-17,19,20,22,23,29,30 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 6-8E * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 28 * [A] 10-12,24-26 [I] 3,7,13,14,18,21,27,28; | [XAI]US5940444 (JENKIN KEITH R [US], et al) [X] 1,9,16,23,29,30 * abstract * * figures 1A-6C * * column 2, lines 45-65 * * page 3, lines 36-49 * * page 4, lines 8-41 * * column 8, line 65 - column 11, line 65 * [A] 2-8,11,12,17-22,25,26[I] 10,13-15,24,27,28; | [XAI]WO2009026475 (MOCKETT GREGORY P [US]) [X] 1,10-12,15,16,24-26,29,30 * abstract * * figures 1, 6 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0092] - [0094] * [A] 2-8,17-22 [I] 9,13,14,23,27,28 |