EP2945772 - SOLDER ALLOYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/48] | ALLOYS | ||
[2016/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEHL, Gunther Niddaweg 4 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
SILZE, Frank Lehmgasse 1 01665 Triebischtal / DE | 03 /
KEMPF, Bernd Riemenschneiderstraße 38 63839 Kleinwallstadt / DE | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 14702765.0 | 17.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014EP50937 | Priority number, date | EP20130151874 | 18.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13151874 | [2015/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014111538 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2945772 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2945772 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B21B1/22, C22C5/08, C22C9/00, C22C30/02, B23K35/30 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
B23K35/302 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/30 (EP,CN,US);
B21B1/22 (US);
B23K1/00 (US);
B23K35/3006 (EP,CN,US);
C22C30/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | B23K35/30, B23K35/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LOTLEGIERUNGEN | [2016/30] | English: | SOLDER ALLOYS | [2016/30] | French: | ALLIAGES DE BRASAGE | [2016/30] |
Former [2015/48] | LÖTLEGIERUNGEN | ||
Former [2015/48] | ALLOYS | ||
Former [2015/48] | ALLIAGES | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2014 | AL | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | MT | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | IE | 17.01.2017 | LU | 17.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.01.2014 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.01.2014 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.01.2014 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.01.2014 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 17.01.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU450673 ; | [A]SU637217 ; | SU450673 [ ]; | SU637217 [ ] (ANDREEVA LIDIYA [SU], et al); | [IA]JPH04339590 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [I] 1-13,15-21 * abstract * [A] 14; | [A]DE19629375 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE19629376 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (19750407), vol. 1975, no. 39, Database accession no. 1975-65066W, XP002726130 & SU450673 A 19750407 (KOVALEVSKII P E) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 37, Database accession no. 1979-67698B, XP002726131 & SU637217 A1 19781220 (ANDREEVA L I) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | by applicant | US2303272 | JPS57149092 | JPS57149093 |