EP2951023 - SECURITY DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, Brian Gnomes Oak Fleet Hampshire GU51 5HZ / GB | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/50] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 14702937.5 | 03.02.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014GB50282 | Priority number, date | GB20130001792 | 01.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201301792 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014118567 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2951023 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2951023 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP2951023 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/29, B42D25/00, B42D25/21 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP,GB);
G07D7/003 (GB);
B42D25/21 (US);
B42D25/00 (EP);
G03H1/0011 (GB,US);
G03H1/0244 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | B41M3/14, B42D15/00, B42D25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2017/20] | English: | SECURITY DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2015/50] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CEUX-CI | [2017/22] |
Former [2015/50] | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2015/50] | DISPOSITIFS DE SÉCURITÉ ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 17.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2018
15.02.2019
WITHDRAWN CCL Secure Pty Ltd Potter Street Craigieburn VIC 3064 / AU Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2018
WITHDRAWN CCL Secure Pty Ltd Potter Street Craigieburn VIC 3064 / AU Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | 30.07.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.12.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 28.03.2019 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2019/31] | Limitations: | 26.03.2019 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 10.09.2019 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2014 | AL | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IE | 03.02.2018 | LU | 03.02.2018 | MT | 03.02.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.02.2014 | |
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 03.02.2014 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3744650 (MATTHIESEN GEB SIEVERS GERDA [DE]) [A] 1-33 * column 5, lines 31-54; figures 2,3 *; | [XAI]WO9527925 (APPLIED HOLOGRAPHICS [GB], et al) [X] 19 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-18,21-33 [I] 20; | [X]US5658411 (FAYKISH LYNN E [US]) [X] 19 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 61; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0162516 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 10, lines 4-20 * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 8; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2005051675 (PRINTETCH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 9, lines 17-18 * * page 12, paragraph last - page 13, paragraph first * * page 17, paragraph last - page 18, line 2 * * page 25, paragraph 2 - page 26, line 6; figures 1,11,12 *; | [AD]WO2008031170 (SECURENCY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [AD] 1-33 * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 8 * * page 15, lines 5-13; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2065766 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-33* paragraphs [0060] - [0063]; figure 1a *; | [A]WO2011017741 (SECURENCY INT PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 12, lines 13-15 * * page 13, lines 7-16 * * page 14, lines 14-23; figures 1-2 * | Opposition | DE3744650 | EP0338378 | WO9527925 | US5658411 | WO0200445 | US6712399 | WO2005051675 | WO2008031170 | US2009115185 | EP2065766 | WO2010042999 | WO2011017741 | WO2011104551 | WO2011116425 | WO2012019226 | US8144399 | AU2011101684B | WO2013054119 |