EP3014156 - A PIPE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flex-Seal Couplings Limited Endeavour Works Newlands Way Valley Park Wombwell Barnsley, South Yorkshire S73 0UW / GB | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILNES, David 58 Broom Lane Rotherham Yorkshire S60 3EL / GB | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14703155.3 | 09.01.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014GB50047 | Priority number, date | GB20130011171 | 24.06.2013 Original published format: GB 201311171 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014207431 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014156 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/00, F16L25/14 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
F16L21/005 (EP);
F16L25/14 (EP,GB);
F16L25/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | ROHRVERBINDUNG | [2016/18] | English: | A PIPE COUPLING | [2016/18] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAU | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5002317 (BURKIT JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-4,8-15,18-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 47 * [Y] 5-7,21,22 [I] 16,17; | [XY]WO2011025935 (NORMA US HOLDING LLC [US], et al) [X] 21 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 12 * [Y] 5-7,21,22; | [XY]FR2689204 (LUPAN AG [CH]) [X] 21 * abstract * * page 6, lines 32-36 * [Y] 5-7,21,22; | [A]FR2602569 (GERU CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |