EP2953440 - STRIP TILLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kverneland Group Les Landes Genusson 9 Rue du Poitou 85130 Les Landes Genusson / FR | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HULIN, Guillaume 3 rue des Châtaigniers 44230 Saint Sébastien sur Loire / FR | [2022/01] |
Former [2015/51] | 01 /
HULIN, Guillaume 42 rue Mellier 44100 Nantes / FR | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | Morris, Jonathan Paul, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | ||
Former [2015/51] | Morris, Jonathan Paul Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14703399.7 | 10.02.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014EP52559 | Priority number, date | GB20130002395 | 11.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201302395 | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014122311 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953440 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2953440 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01B37/00, A01B63/24, A01B79/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
A01B37/00 (EP,US);
A01B79/005 (EP,GB,US);
G05D3/00 (US);
A01B33/00 (GB);
A01B33/087 (GB);
A01B63/24 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULCHSAATSYSTEM | [2015/51] | English: | STRIP TILLING SYSTEM | [2015/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LABOURAGE EN BANDES | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2020 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2014 | AL | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | IT | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | MT | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | TR | 05.01.2022 | IE | 10.02.2022 | LU | 10.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
TR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 10.02.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5095997 (WARNER STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * figure -; claim - *; | [XI]US5479992 (BASSETT JAMES H [US]) [X] 41 * abstract * * column 8, line 14 - line 46 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 1-40,42; | [XI]US5709271 (BASSETT JAMES H [US]) [X] 41 * abstract * * column 7, line 6 - line 41 * * column 8, line 66 - line 67 * * column 9, line 1 - line 12 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 1-40,42; | [A]US6510367 (MCQUINN ALVIN E [US]) [A] 1-42 * abstract ** figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2012173090 (CORCORAN PAUL THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * figure -; claim - * | Examination | US2012125244 | EP2497348 |