Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015069448 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015017093 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414167094 | 29.01.2014 | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120991 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120913 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A3 | WO2014120913 | 07.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120854 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A3 | WO2014120854 | 07.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120736 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120729 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120475 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | A3 | WO2014120475 | 07.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015336219 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | US201414533390 | 05.11.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015275687 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015125335 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9770781 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2017 | B2 | US2014220374 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013316183 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9315903 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2016 | B2 | US2013142965 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9352419 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B2 | US2013140279 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9352413 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B2 | US2013140278 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9283593 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | US2013136868 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012181255 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113005656 | 13.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10190220 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2014248512 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414167094 | 29.01.2014 | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160079873 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61472 | 21.10.2014 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150113149 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13972 | 31.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150111367 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US13717 | 30.01.2014 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150111352 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13541 | 29.01.2014 | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150110799 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | WO2014US13548 | 29.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150106007 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US14123 | 31.01.2014 | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102280670B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2021 | B1 | KR20160036060 | 01.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | WO2014US45931 | 09.07.2014 | US201414167094 | 29.01.2014 | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101791976B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | B1 | KR20150114535 | 12.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | WO2014US13837 | 30.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101791113B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2017 | B1 | KR20150111366 | 05.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US11963 | 17.01.2014 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6494680B | Global Dossier | 03.04.2019 | B2 | JP2017119309 | 06.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016516580 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | WO2014US13548 | 29.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016513200 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US14123 | 31.01.2014 | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016511697 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13972 | 31.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6099771B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B2 | JP2016511150 | 14.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | WO2014US13837 | 30.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016509541 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13541 | 29.01.2014 | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6092429B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2017 | B2 | JP2016508449 | 22.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US11963 | 17.01.2014 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6117382B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | B2 | JP2016506872 | 07.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US13717 | 30.01.2014 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3065911 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61472 | 21.10.2014 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950973 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | WO2014US13548 | 29.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950972 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2016 | B1 | EP2950972 | 09.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | WO2014US13837 | 30.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950967 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2016 | B1 | EP2950967 | 09.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US13717 | 30.01.2014 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950966 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2016 | B1 | EP2950966 | 09.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US11963 | 17.01.2014 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950965 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13541 | 29.01.2014 | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950950 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13972 | 31.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105705292 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US61472 | 21.10.2014 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105431250B | Global Dossier | 14.02.2020 | B | CN105431250 | 23.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | WO2014US45931 | 09.07.2014 | US201414167094 | 29.01.2014 | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105358289 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | WO2014US13837 | 30.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105307811B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2017 | B | CN105307811 | 03.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US11963 | 17.01.2014 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105283264 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US13717 | 30.01.2014 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105263667 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13972 | 31.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105246644 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US14123 | 31.01.2014 | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104955983 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13541 | 29.01.2014 | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104955612 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | WO2014US13548 | 29.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2950974 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US14123 | 31.01.2014 | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015118441 | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414533390 | 05.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112014003501T | 28.04.2016 | T5 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | WO2014US45931 | 09.07.2014 | US201414167094 | 29.01.2014 | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | US201314071774 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2624884 | 07.07.2017 | C2 | RU2015131614 | 10.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201414165732 | 28.01.2014 | WO2014US13837 | 30.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015131615 | 07.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13972 | 31.01.2014 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015131619 | 10.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US14123 | 31.01.2014 | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2627824 | 11.08.2017 | C2 | RU2015131826 | 07.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US11963 | 17.01.2014 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2621095 | 31.05.2017 | C2 | RU2015131829 | 10.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US13717 | 30.01.2014 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015136515 | 07.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US13541 | 29.01.2014 | US201313755073 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015136564 | 06.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313755625 | 31.01.2013 | WO2014US13548 | 29.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA515360775 | 20.02.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201314144680 | 31.12.2013 | WO2014US13717 | 30.01.2014 | US201361758795 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA515360800 | 11.02.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US11963 | 17.01.2014 | US201313755064 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014121060 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 |