EP2950974 - LOCALIZED REPAIR OF SUPERALLOY COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCK, Gerald J. 1325 Fairhaven Court Oviedo, Florida 32766 / US | 02 /
KAMEL, Ahmed 2439 Guiana Plum Drive Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14704269.1 | 31.01.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014US14123 | Priority number, date | US201313755098 | 31.01.2013 Original published format: US201313755098 | US201313956431 | 01.08.2013 Original published format: US201313956431 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014121060 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950974 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23P6/00, B23P6/04, B23K26/34, F01D5/00 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
B23P6/007 (EP);
B23K26/342 (EP);
F01D11/127 (EP);
F01D5/005 (EP);
B23K2101/001 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Title | German: | LOKALEN REPARATUR VON SUPERLEGIERUNGSKOMPONENTEN | [2015/50] | English: | LOCALIZED REPAIR OF SUPERALLOY COMPONENT | [2015/50] | French: | RÉPARATION LOCALISÉE D'UN COMPOSANT DE SUPERALLIAGE | [2015/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2016 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 17.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2395199 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36]; claim 1 * [I] 1-7,9-12; | [A]US2005194363 (HU YIPING [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1, 9-11 *; | [A]US2005274009 (POWERS JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2012181255 |