EP2969377 - NEAR EUTECTIC COMPOSITION NICKEL BASE SANDWICH BRAZE FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZBAYSAL, Kazim 13554 Lakes Way Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | 02 /
KAMEL, Ahmed 2439 Guiana Plum Drive Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14705653.5 | 03.02.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US14417 | Priority number, date | US201361782922P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361782922 P | US201414167159 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: US201414167159 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014158349 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969377 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/30, B23K35/32, B23K35/02, C22C19/05 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B23K35/0238 (EP,US);
B23K35/0233 (EP,US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,US);
B23K35/304 (EP,US);
B23K35/32 (EP,US);
B23K35/325 (EP,US);
C22C19/007 (EP,US);
C22C19/05 (EP,US);
C22C19/057 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12438 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | HARTGELÖTETE SANDWICHFOLIE MIT EINER NAHEZU EUTEKTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF NICKELBASIS | [2016/03] | English: | NEAR EUTECTIC COMPOSITION NICKEL BASE SANDWICH BRAZE FOIL | [2016/03] | French: | FEUILLE DE BRASAGE EN SANDWICH À BASE DE NICKEL ET COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION QUASI EUTECTIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 04.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2017 | Request for further processing for: | 04.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0671240 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-12,15 * column 3, lines 40-55 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 4 * * figure 3; claims 1-4, 7-10 * [Y] 4,14 [I] 3,13; | [Y]US2006131359 (POHLMAN MATTHEW J [US]) [Y] 4,14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008]; claims 1-24 *; | [A]JP2004291076 (HITACHI CABLE) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061]; claim 2 *; | [A]EP1864749 (NEOMAX MATERIALS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 9-15 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2001038029 (WEIHS TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [A] 3,4,13,14 * paragraphs [0047] , [0058] , [0060] *; | [A]US2003164289 (WEIHS TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [A] 3,4,13,14 * paragraphs [0056] , [0061] , [0067]; claim 42 * | Examination | JP2008238188 | JP2006181586 | JP2009214119 | JP2006272363 | US2010038412 | by applicant | US8640942 |