EP2956651 - METHOD OF DETERMINATION OF EXHAUST GAS PRESSURE UPSTREAM OF A TURBO CHARGER AND OF GAS FLOW AMOUNT PASSING THROUGH ITS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/52] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE EXHAUST GAS PRESSURE UPSTREAM OF THE TURBO COMPRESSOR AND FOR DETERMINING THE FLOW RATE PASSING THROUGH THE TURBINE THEREOF | ||
[2022/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2020/46] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | ||
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACILLY, Christophe 74 rue Raymond Patenotre F-78120 Rambouillet / FR | 02 /
TRELLE, Frédéric 100 ave Massenet F-93150 Le Blanc Mesnil / FR | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14705847.3 | 30.01.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014FR50165 | Priority number, date | FR20130051374 | 18.02.2013 Original published format: FR 1351374 | [2015/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014125185 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2956651 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2956651 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/14, F02D23/02, F02B37/12, F02B37/18, F02D41/18 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
F02D41/0007 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
F02D23/02 (EP);
F02D41/1445 (EP);
F02D41/1446 (EP);
F02D41/145 (EP);
F02D2200/0402 (EP);
F02D2200/101 (EP);
F02D41/182 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFARHEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES ABGASDRUCKS STROMAUFWÄRTS EINES TURBOLADERS UND DER ÜBER DESSEN TURBINE FLIESSENDEN GASMENGE | [2022/30] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINATION OF EXHAUST GAS PRESSURE UPSTREAM OF A TURBO CHARGER AND OF GAS FLOW AMOUNT PASSING THROUGH ITS TURBINE | [2022/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA PRESSION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT EN AMONT DU TURBOCOMPRESSEUR ET DU DEBIT TRAVERSANT SA TURBINE | [2015/52] |
Former [2015/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES ABGASDRUCKS VOR DEM TURBOVERDICHTER UND ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER STRÖMUNGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT DURCH DIE TURBINE | ||
Former [2015/52] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE EXHAUST GAS PRESSURE UPSTREAM OF THE TURBO COMPRESSOR AND FOR DETERMINING THE FLOW RATE PASSING THROUGH THE TURBINE THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | IE | 30.01.2023 | LU | 30.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
IT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10328056 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2853693 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004051837 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2921114 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009094009 (MULLER MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0107]; figure - * |