Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2953910 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480017526 CN201810706913 EP14706219 JP2015557150 KR20157024842 US2014015471W US201414176470 US201715411266



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9567259Global Dossier 14.02.2017B2
US2015225287 13.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414176470 10.02.2014
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10155691Global Dossier 18.12.2018B2
US2017129809 11.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715411266 20.01.2017
US201414176470 10.02.2014
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150125951Global Dossier 10.11.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014US15471 10.02.2014
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2016513055Global Dossier 12.05.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US15471 10.02.2014
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108751744BGlobal Dossier 29.06.2021B
CN108751744 06.11.2018A
Priority number Date
US201361763262 11.02.2013
CN201480017526 10.02.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105228967BGlobal Dossier 31.07.2018B
CN105228967 06.01.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US15471 10.02.2014
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2953910Global Dossier 16.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US15471 10.02.2014
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014124348Global Dossier 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI610901B 11.01.2018B
TW201441175 01.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201361763262 11.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI662005B 11.06.2019B
TW201811703 01.04.2018A
Priority number Date
US201361763262 11.02.2013