EP2973495 - PERSONALIZED PARKING ASSISTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIPPELHOFFER, Mario 720 Tulane Ct. San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 02 /
CAMHI, Jaime 4009 Miranda Ave. Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14706514.8 | 13.02.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014EP52800 | Priority number, date | US201313987304 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313987304 | US201313849876 | 25.03.2013 Original published format: US201313849876 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014139749 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973495 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/14, G07B15/02 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q50/40 (EP);
G07B15/02 (EP);
G08G1/14 (EP);
G08G1/143 (EP);
G06Q2240/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERTE PARKHILFE | [2016/03] | English: | PERSONALIZED PARKING ASSISTANT | [2016/03] | French: | ASSISTANCE DE STATIONNEMENT PERSONNALISÉE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2019 | 27.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 18.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2009075033 ; | [I]US2005096974 (CHAGOLY BRYAN C [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * figures 2-9 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] ** paragraphs [0039] - [0055] *; | [I]JP2009075033 (AISIN AW CO, et al) [I] 1,5,9,11,16 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 30] *; | [I]EP2133664 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [I] 1-18 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0088] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 26, Database accession no. 2009-G95219, XP002722317 & JP2009075033 A 20090409 (AISIN AW CO LTD) [I] 1,5,9,11,16 * abstract * |