EP2959482 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENCODING OR DECODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL USING A TRANSIENT-LOCATION DEPENDENT OVERLAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELMRICH, Christian Hauptstrasse 68 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
LECOMTE, Jérémie Ullsteinstrasse 32 90763 Fürth / DE | 03 /
MARKOVIC, Goran Aachener Strasse 19 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
SCHNELL, Markus Labenwolfstr. 15 90409 Nürnberg / DE | 05 /
EDLER, Bernd Unterfarrnbacher Strasse 29 90766 Fürth / DE | 06 /
REUSCHL, Stefan Therese-Müller-Strasse 24 90451 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/18] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
HELMRICH, Christian Hauptstrasse 68 91054 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
LECOMTE, Jérémie Turnstrasse 7 90763 Fürth / DE | |||
03 /
MARKOVIC, Goran Aachener Strasse 19 90425 Nürnberg / DE | |||
04 /
SCHNELL, Markus Rieterstrasse 5 90419 Nürnberg / DE | |||
05 /
EDLER, Bernd Unterfarrnbacher Strasse 29 90766 Fürth / DE | |||
06 /
REUSCHL, Stefan Therese-Müller-Strasse 24 90451 Nürnberg / DE | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14706529.6 | 20.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP53293 | Priority number, date | US201361767115P | 20.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767115 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014128197 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959482 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2959482 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/022, G10L19/02 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
G10L19/0212 (EP,US);
G10L19/025 (RU,US);
G10L19/022 (EP,US);
H03M7/3044 (RU);
H04N19/172 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/44 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | G10L19/025 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG ODER DECODIERUNG EINES TONSIGNALS MIT ÜBERGANGSORTABHÄNGIGER ÜBERLAPPUNG | [2016/01] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENCODING OR DECODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL USING A TRANSIENT-LOCATION DEPENDENT OVERLAP | [2016/01] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE OU DE DÉCODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO AU MOYEN D'UN CHEVAUCHEMENT DÉPENDANT D'UN EMPLACEMENT DE TRANSITOIRE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19164500.1 / EP3525207 | EP24167580.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2014 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.02.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 01.05.2019 | |
NO | 01.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9105412 (TELEFUNKEN FERNSEH & RUNDFUNK [DE]); | Examination | WO2008022566 |