EP2806927 - INSUFFLATION TUBE COMPRISING A HUMIDIFYING MATERIAL AND A HEATING ELEMENT, FOR LAPAROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.O.M. World of Medicine GmbH Salzufer 8 10587 Berlin / DE | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖTH, Yves Apfelwicklerstrasse 23 12683 Berlin / DE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14706768.0 | 15.01.2014 | [2017/11] | WO2014DE00017 | Priority number, date | DE20131000492 | 15.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013000492 | DE20131010097 | 18.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013010097 | [2014/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014111083 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806927 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2806927 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M13/00, A61M16/08, A61B1/313 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
A61B1/3132 (EP,US);
A61B17/3474 (US);
A61M13/003 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (US);
A61M16/18 (US);
A61M2202/0225 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3372 (US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1021 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | A61M13/00, A61M16/08, A61M16/16, A61B1/313 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSUFFLATIONSSCHLAUCH MIT BEFEUCHTUNGSMATERIAL UND HEIZELEMENT FÜR DIE LAPAROSKOPIE | [2014/49] | English: | INSUFFLATION TUBE COMPRISING A HUMIDIFYING MATERIAL AND A HEATING ELEMENT, FOR LAPAROSCOPY | [2014/49] | French: | TUBE D'INSUFFLATION POURVU D'UN AGENT D'HUMIDIFICATION ET D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CHAUFFE POUR LA LAPAROSCOPIE | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 25.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2014 | AL | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | MT | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/29] | HU | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2250542 (TELECTRONICS PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-8 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seite 4 *; | [Y]WO0232486 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 17 * * page 7, line 3 - page 10, line 12 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 15 * * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 4 * * page 12, line 35 - page 14, line 13 * * page 17, line 33 - page 24, line 2 * * figures 1, 3, 6-8, 16-22 *; | [XYI]US2003181857 (BLAKE JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Absätze [0018]-[0028] * [Y] 5-8 [I] 6,7; | [XYI]US2004254524 (SPEARMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1-3A, 7, 8, 13, 14 * [Y] 3,6,7 [I] 6,7; | [Y]WO2008095245 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-8 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Absätze [0066]-[0067] und Zeichungen 8-9 *; | [Y]WO2009015410 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [00118] * * figures 1-7, 17-20 *; | [A]WO2011078701 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 19 * * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 13 * * page 28, line 6 - page 31, line 3; figures 1, 2 *; | [XP]WO2013137753 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ]) [XP] 1,2,5,7 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0239] - paragraph [0242] * * paragraph [0311] - paragraph [0325] * * paragraph [0351] - paragraph [0367] * * figures 1B, 37A, 40A-40H ** paragraph [0276] - paragraph [0278] * | by applicant | DE4211986 | DE4331559 | DE19510710 | US6068609 | EP0827417 | US2010206308 |