EP2961682 - A DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONNECTING A VEHICLE TO AN ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipalco B.V. Pompmolenlaan 13c 3447 GK Woerden / NL | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERUZZI, Sandro Cavotec Specimas S.p.A. Via Galvani 1 I-20834 Nova Milanese / IT | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Pronovem Luxembourg 12, avenue du Rock n' Roll BP 327 4004 Esch sur Alzette / LU | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14706847.2 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP53813 | Priority number, date | LU20130092160 | 27.02.2013 Original published format: LU 92160 | LU20130092161 | 27.02.2013 Original published format: LU 92161 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014131826 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961682 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961682 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/12, B66C19/00, H01H9/54, H01R13/62, H02G11/02 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
B66C13/12 (EP,CN,US);
B66C19/007 (EP,CN,US);
H01H9/54 (US);
H01R13/6205 (US);
H02G11/02 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | B66C13/12, B66C19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ANSCHLIESSEN EINES FAHRZEUGS AN EIN ELEKTRISCHES ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSNETZ | [2016/01] | English: | A DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONNECTING A VEHICLE TO AN ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR RACCORDER AUTOMATIQUEMENT UN VÉHICULE À UNE ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 15.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2014 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | IE | 27.02.2017 | LU | 27.02.2017 | MT | 27.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
MT | 27.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
MT | 27.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
MT | 27.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
MT | 27.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
MT | 27.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]CN202148142U ; | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 24, Database accession no. 2012-C87614, XP002714851 & CN202148142U U 20120222 (GAO J) [AD] 1 * abstract * * figure - * |