EP2961706 - NANOSTRUCTURED LENSES AND VITROCERAMICS THAT ARE TRANSPARENT IN VISIBLE AND INFRARED RANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2020/29] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENU, Sébastien 172 rue Marcel Belot F-45160 Olivet / FR | 02 /
ALLIX, Mathieu 2414 rue Paulin Labarre F-45160 Olivet / FR | 03 /
MATZEN, Guy 78 rue Henry Petiet F-45560 Saint Denis En Val / FR | 04 /
VERON, Emmanuel 1B rue du Général de Gaulle F-45650 Saint Jean Le Blanc / FR | 05 /
CARDINAL, Thierry 25 chemin de Nelson F-33770 Salles / FR | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2020/29] |
Former [2016/01] | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14707174.0 | 28.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP53932 | Priority number, date | FR20130051795 | 28.02.2013 Original published format: FR 1351795 | [2016/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014131881 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961706 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961706 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/062, C03C3/066, C03C10/00, C03C3/089, C03C4/10, C03C3/253 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C03C3/089 (EP,US);
C03C10/0009 (US);
C03B32/02 (US);
C03C10/00 (EP,US);
C03C3/062 (EP,US);
C03C3/064 (US);
C03C3/066 (EP,US);
C03C3/078 (US);
C03C3/097 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | C03C3/253, C03C10/00, C03C3/064, C03C3/089, C03C4/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN SICHTBAREN UND INFAROT-BEREICHEN TRANSPARENTE NANOSTRUKTURIERTE LINSEN UND VITROKERAMIK | [2016/01] | English: | NANOSTRUCTURED LENSES AND VITROCERAMICS THAT ARE TRANSPARENT IN VISIBLE AND INFRARED RANGES | [2016/01] | French: | VERRES ET VITROCÉRAMIQUES NANOSTRUCTURES TRANSPARENTS DANS LE VISIBLE ET L'INFRAROUGE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 04.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2014 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | GB | 28.02.2021 | IE | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | LU | 28.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.02.2014 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
GB | 28.02.2021 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 28.02.2014 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
GB | 28.02.2021 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 28.02.2014 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
GB | 28.02.2021 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
GB | 28.02.2021 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
GB | 28.02.2021 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]CN1587142 (SHANGHAI INST OPTICS & FINE ME [CN]) [X] 2,3,6-8,13,15 * examples 33-39 * [Y] 1,14 [I] 4,5,9-12,16,17; | [XDYI]WO2008075546 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 2,3,6-8,12,13,15 * examples 12,17,19,20,23,42,43,52 * [Y] 1,14 [I] 4,5,9-11,16,17; | [XDYI] - MURTHY M K ET AL, "PROPERTIES AND STRUCTURE OF GLASSES IN THE SYSTEM M2O-GA2O3-GEO2 (M = LI, NA, K)", PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF GLASSES, SOCIETY OF GLASS TECHNOLOGY, SHEFFIELD, GB, (19670201), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 0031-9090, pages 26 - 29, XP001216308 [XD] 2,3,6-8,13 * column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1; tables 2,3 * [Y] 1,14 [I] 4,5,9-12,15-17 | [ID] - LIPINSKA-KALITA K E ET AL, "Spectroscopic properties of Cr<3+> ions in nanocrystalline glass-ceramic composites", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 352, no. 6-7, doi:10.1016/J.JNONCRYSOL.2005.11.039, ISSN 0022-3093, (20060515), pages 524 - 527, (20060515), XP028046492 [ID] 1,14 * page 525, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnoncrysol.2005.11.039 | [Y] - SIGAEV V N ET AL, "Nickel-assisted growth and selective doping of spinel-like gallium oxide nanocrystals in germano-silicate glasses for infrared broadband light emission;Nickel-assisted growth and selective doping of spinel-like gallium oxide nanocrystals in germano-silicate glasses for infrared broadband light emiss", NANOTECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20111208), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/23/1/015708, ISSN 0957-4484, page 15708, XP020216657 [Y] 1,14 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/23/1/015708 |