EP2961899 - ACTUATION HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/01] | ACTUATING HANDLE | ||
[2016/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALMAR s.p.a. Loc. Merlaro 9 25070 Nozza di Vestone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states ALMAR s.p.a. Loc. Merlaro 9 25070 Nozza di Vestone BS / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINELLI, Simone Loc. Osmeri 14 I-25070 Barghe, Brescia / IT | 02 /
MARTINELLI, Pierluigi Loc. Osmeri 1 I-25070 Barghe, Brescia / IT | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Friedrich, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14707330.8 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP00522 | Priority number, date | DE20132001957U | 28.02.2013 Original published format: DE 202013001957 U | [2016/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014131522 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961899 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961899 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/04, E05B3/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
E05B3/00 (EP);
E05B3/04 (EP);
E05B2003/006 (EP);
E05B63/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSHANDHABE | [2016/01] | English: | ACTUATION HANDLE | [2016/21] | French: | POIGNÉE DE COMMANDE | [2016/01] |
Former [2016/01] | ACTUATING HANDLE | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 08.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2014 | AL | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IE | 27.02.2017 | LU | 27.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.02.2014 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2179441 (THOMAS WEBB PURCELL ET AL) [I] 1-7 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2241704 (ARAN S R L [IT]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2012045702 (LECLERCQ PASCAL [IT]; LAMPERTI MARCO EZIO ENEA [IT]) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2001254538 (NISHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |