EP2965358 - LED MODULE AND LIGHTING ASSEMBLY HAVING A CORRESPONDING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizer Straße 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBNER, Stephan Lannerstraße 10 A-6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14708246.5 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014EP54240 | Priority number, date | DE201310203728 | 05.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013203728 | [2016/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014135577 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2965358 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2965358 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21K9/00, F21V5/00, F21V29/10, F21Y105/12, F21Y105/10, F21K9/60, F21Y115/10, H05B33/08 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
F21V5/00 (EP,US);
F21K9/60 (EP,US);
F21V29/10 (US);
H05B45/40 (EP,US);
F21K9/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/02] | H01L25/16, H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-MODUL UND BELEUCHTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT ENTSPRECHENDEM MODUL | [2016/02] | English: | LED MODULE AND LIGHTING ASSEMBLY HAVING A CORRESPONDING MODULE | [2016/02] | French: | MODULE DEL ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT MODULE DEL | [2017/47] |
Former [2016/02] | MODULE À DEL ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT MODULE À DEL | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2014 | AL | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | MT | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 05.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2012043700 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 10] , [0 17] , [0020] - [0022] * [Y] 4-9; | [XAY]CN202402975U (MACOSTAR PHYSICS APPLIC TECHNOLOGY DEV WUHAN LTD) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [A] 5,7 [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2010020267 (KOBAYASHI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * figures 7,8A,9 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [ 120] - [0123] - [ 135] - [0138] * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US2006255753 (SAWADA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7 * figure 9 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0012] *; | [XAY]WO2007136020 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figures 1-3 * * page 10, line 5 - page 18, line 2 * [A] 5,7 [Y] 8,9; | [A]US2011316009 (FUKASAWA KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0022] - [0 61] - [0068] * | Examination | EP2878883 |