EP2987337 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADAPTIVE NOISE CANCELLATION INCLUDING DYNAMIC BIAS OF COEFFICIENTS OF AN ADAPTIVE NOISE CANCELLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cirrus Logic, Inc. 800 West 6th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2023/52] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Cirrus Logic, Inc. 800 West 6th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRIX, Jon, D. 1351 Thompson Ranch Road Wimberley, Texas 78676 / US | 02 /
LI, Ning 111 Dasher Drive Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 03 /
ALDERSON, Jeffrey, D. 7705 Twilight Mesa Drive Austin, Texas 78737 / US | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Knöner, Gregor, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | [2023/52] |
Former [2016/08] | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 14708427.1 | 20.02.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014US17343 | Priority number, date | US201361811915P | 15.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361811915 P | US201313950854 | 25.07.2013 Original published format: US201313950854 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014172005 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987337 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2987337 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, G10K11/178 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
G10K11/17817 (EP,US);
G10K11/17823 (EP,US);
G10K11/17827 (EP,US);
G10K11/17854 (EP,US);
G10K11/17881 (EP,US);
G10K11/17885 (EP,US);
H04R1/1083 (EP,US);
H04R5/033 (US);
G10K2210/108 (EP,US);
G10K2210/1081 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3026 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ADAPTIVEN RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER VORSPANNUNG DER KOEFFIZIENTEN EINES ADAPTIVES RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNGSSYSTEMS | [2016/08] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADAPTIVE NOISE CANCELLATION INCLUDING DYNAMIC BIAS OF COEFFICIENTS OF AN ADAPTIVE NOISE CANCELLATION SYSTEM | [2016/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'ANNULATION ADAPTATIVE DU BRUIT UTILISANT LA POLARISATION DYNAMIQUE DES COEFFICIENTS D'UN SYSTÈME ADAPTATIF D'ANNULATION DE BRUIT | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004009007 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US]) [A] 25-39* the whole document *; | [XI]US2010061564 (CLEMOW RICHARD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,17-20 * the whole document * [I] 5,13,21; | [XI]US2011007907 (PARK HYUN JIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19,25-28,30-33,35-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0104] - [0116] - [ 162] * [I] 29,34,39; | [A]US2012170766 (ALVES ROGERIO GUEDES [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [XD]US2012308024 (ALDERSON JEFFREY [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,6-11,14-19,22-24 * the whole document * |