EP2962388 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING POLE SLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innio Jenbacher GmbH & Co OG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | [2019/16] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co OG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHRINGER, Albert Mühlbergweg 26 A-6345 Kössen / AT | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [2016/01] | Gangl, Markus, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 14708787.8 | 05.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014AT00023 | Priority number, date | AT20130000156 | 28.02.2013 Original published format: AT 1562013 | [2016/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014138757 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2962388 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2962388 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/00, H02P29/024, G01R31/34, H02H7/06, H02P9/00, H02P9/10 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
G01R31/343 (EP,US);
H02P9/006 (EP,AT,US);
G01P3/00 (US);
H02H7/06 (EP,AT,US);
H02P29/0241 (EP,US);
H02P9/107 (EP,US);
H02J3/00 (AT)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | H02P29/02, H02H7/06, H02J3/00, G01R31/34, H02P9/10, H02P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON POLSCHLUPF | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING POLE SLIP | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE GLISSEMENT DE PÔLE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 10.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2014 | AL | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | NL | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.02.2014 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 24.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2823201 (HOEHNE FRIEDRICH DIPL ING) [A] 1-11 * page 8 - page 9; figure 4 *; | [A]DE2920735 (ELIN UNION AG) [A] 1-11 * page 6 - page 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010039077 (DALBY DENIS HEDLEY [GB]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figure 2 *; | [AP]WO2013102849 (COMAP A S [CZ], et al) [AP] 1-11* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0084]; figures 1-8,12-14 * |