08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
03.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
31.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
14.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
07.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
07.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
14.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.04.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
13.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
04.12.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
26.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
07.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|