EP2996894 - POWER WHEEL FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Norbert Im Haenferstueck 5 77855 Achern / DE | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14709272.0 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014EP54635 | Priority number, date | DE201310209218 | 17.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013209218 | [2016/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183896 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996894 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60K7/00, B60B25/00, B60B21/02, B60B21/12 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
B60K7/0007 (EP);
B60B21/026 (EP);
B60B25/008 (EP);
B60B3/048 (EP);
B60B21/12 (EP);
B60B25/006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSRAD FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2016/12] | English: | POWER WHEEL FOR A VEHICLE | [2016/12] | French: | ROUE MOTRICE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 07.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2506146 (GLADISH FRANK L) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * figure 2 * [A] 3,6,8,9 [I] 10; | [XI]EP2149470 (LORINSER SPORT SERVICE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * figure 7 * [I] 10; | [XI]DE102008019974 (JEKAT HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * figure 2 * [I] 10; | [XI]WO9622895 (SCHMID EGON [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * figure - * [I] 10; | [XI]DE19837270 (HENNING MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * figure 1 * [I] 10 |