EP2950935 - FOAM DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Consultants Limited Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, CB4 0DW / GB | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICMANIS, Mark c/o Cambridge Consultants Limited Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DW / GB | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Smith, Jeremy Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14709355.3 | 03.02.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014GB50297 | Priority number, date | GB20130001875 | 01.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201301875 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014118573 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950935 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2950935 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/00, A61K8/04, B65D83/60, B65D83/66 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
B05B7/0025 (EP,GB,US);
A47K5/12 (GB);
B65D83/753 (US);
A47K5/1208 (GB);
A47K5/1209 (GB);
A47K5/1211 (GB);
A47K5/122 (GB);
B05B7/0018 (GB,RU);
B05B7/0031 (GB);
B05B7/0037 (EP,GB,US);
B05B7/26 (GB);
B05B7/267 (GB);
B65D83/14 (GB);
B65D83/32 (US);
B65D83/60 (EP,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAUMSPENDER | [2015/50] | English: | FOAM DISPENSER | [2015/50] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE MOUSSE | [2015/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 31.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17164021.2 / EP3222362 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2014 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.02.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 03.02.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5842607 (SNIDER JOHN H [US]) [A] 1-51* the whole document *; | [A]AU2011253813 (DEB IP LTD) [A] 1-51 * the whole document * |