EP2958669 - RUPTURABLE RELIABILITY DEVICES FOR CONTINUOUS FLOW REACTOR ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAYOUNI, Khaled 7 impasse Patricia Highsmith F-77140 Moncourt-Fromonville / FR | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14709475.9 | 20.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014US17255 | Priority number, date | US201361768058P | 22.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361768058 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014130605 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958669 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01J19/0006 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G05D7/0629 (US);
B01J2219/0079 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00813 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00824 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00831 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00867 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | ZERREISSBARE ZUVERLÄSSIGKEITSVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR FLUGSTROMREAKTORANORDNUNGEN | [2016/01] | English: | RUPTURABLE RELIABILITY DEVICES FOR CONTINUOUS FLOW REACTOR ASSEMBLIES | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE FIABILITÉ POUVANT ÊTRE ROMPUS POUR ENSEMBLES RÉACTEUR À ÉCOULEMENT CONTINU | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 28.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2007050013 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE], et al) [X] 35 * abstract * * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 22 * * page 15, line 19 - page 16, line 3; figure -; claims 1, 2, 21 * [A] 1-34 [I] 36-38; | [XAI]WO2008145683 (DSM FINE CHEM AUSTRIA GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 35 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 10 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 7; figures 1,5; claim - * [A] 1-34 [I] 36-38; | [A]US4804725 (KANNE FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 68; figure 1; claim - * | [XI] - ELIEZER K F ET AL, "A FLOW MICROREACTOR FOR STUDY OF HIGH-PRESSURE CATALYTIC HYDROPROCESSING REACTIONS", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, FUNDAMENTALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1977), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1021/I160063A014, pages 380 - 384, XP009014541 [X] 35,36,38 * abstract * * page 383, column l, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 381, column r, paragraph 3 - page 382, column l, paragraph 2 * [I] 1-34,37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/i160063a014 | [XAI] - VRINAT M L, "A flow microreactor for laboratory high pressure vapor phase catalytic reactions", REACTION KINETICS AND CATALYSIS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1980), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1007/BF02061340, ISSN 0133-1736, pages 389 - 394, XP002089401 [X] 35 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 5; figure 1 * [A] 1-34 [I] 36-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02061340 |