EP2973088 - IMPROVED USER INTERFACE FOR ACQUISTION, DISPLAY AND ANALYSIS OF OPHTHALMIC DIAGNOSTIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COELHO, Julia 2541 California St. APT 5 San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | 02 /
HORNE, Melissa, R. 2658 College Ave. 3 Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 03 /
NARASIMHA-IYER, Harihar 3736 Carrigan Common Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 04 /
RITTER, Christine, N. 200 Carol Ct. Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 05 /
SRIVASTAVA, Siddharth 3504 Skyline Dr. Hayward, CA 94542 / US | 06 /
STERN, Marc, D. 131 Capricorn Ave. Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 07 /
ZHAO, Zheen 4575 Mangrove Dr. Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 08 /
THOMPSON, Suzanne, M. 4441 Edgewood Ave Oakland CA 94602 / US | 09 /
GUILLEMINOT, Raphael 9 White Str. 201 Brooklyn, NY 11206 / US | 10 /
MCCAULIFF, Jayson, A. 4066 18th Str. San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
COELHO, Julia 2541 California St. APT 5 San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | ||
02 /
HORNE, Melissa, R. 2658 College Ave. 3 Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
03 /
NARASIMHA-IYER, Harihar 3736 Carrigan Common Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
04 /
RITTER, Christine, N. 200 Carol Ct. Alamo, CA 94507 / US | |||
05 /
SRIVASTAVA, Siddharth 3504 Skyline Dr. Hayward, CA 94542 / US | |||
06 /
STERN, Marc, D. 131 Capricorn Ave. Oakland, CA 94611 / US | |||
07 /
ZHAO, Zheen 4575 Mangrove Dr. Dublin, CA 94568 / US | |||
08 /
THOMPSON, Suzanne, M. 3452 18th Street St. San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
09 /
GUILLEMINOT, Raphael 9 White Str. 201 Brooklyn, NY 11206 / US | |||
10 /
MCCAULIFF, Jayson, A. 4066 18th Str. San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | Representative(s) | Beck, Bernard Carl Zeiss AG Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14710265.1 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014EP55074 | Priority number, date | US201361785347P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361785347 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014140254 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2973088 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B3/0033 (US);
A61B3/0025 (US);
A61B3/0058 (US);
A61B3/102 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE ZUR ERFASSUNG, ANZEIGE UND ANALYSE VON AUGENDIAGNOSEDATEN | [2016/03] | English: | IMPROVED USER INTERFACE FOR ACQUISTION, DISPLAY AND ANALYSIS OF OPHTHALMIC DIAGNOSTIC DATA | [2016/03] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR AMÉLIORÉE POUR L'ACQUISITION, L'AFFICHAGE ET L'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE DIAGNOSTIC OPHTALMOLOGIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/16] | 20.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/16] | Divisional application(s) | EP21203575.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |