EP2997477 - PAGE TABLE DATA MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | ||
[2021/35] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRISENTHWAITE, Richard Roy c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridgeshire, CB1 9NJ / GB | ||
02 /
EVANS, Matthew Lucien c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridgeshire, CB1 9NJ / GB | |||
[2021/17] | |||
Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 14710374.1 | 12.03.2014 | |
[2016/12] | |||
WO2014GB50724 | |||
Priority number, date | GB20130008507 | 13.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201308507 | |
US201313926140 | 25.06.2013 Original published format: US201313926140 | ||
[2016/12] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2014184515 | ||
Date: | 20.11.2014 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2014/47] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP2997477 | ||
Date: | 23.03.2016 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2016/12] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP2997477 | ||
Date: | 01.09.2021 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2021/35] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 |
Classification | IPC: | G06F12/1009 | [2021/13] |
CPC: |
G06F12/1009 (EP,GB,US);
G06F12/1416 (GB);
G06F12/1475 (US);
G06F9/30043 (GB);
G06F2212/151 (EP,US)
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | SEITENTABELLEN-DATENVERWALTUNG | [2016/12] |
English: | PAGE TABLE DATA MANAGEMENT | [2016/12] | |
French: | GESTION DE DONNÉES DE TABLES DE PAGE | [2016/12] | |
Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | |
20.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
20.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | |
25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
04.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
12.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | ||
10.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | ||
31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
21.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | ||
21.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
21.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2018 | ||
Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | ||
23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
MT | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
TR | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 12.03.2022 | ||
LU | 12.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
[2024/41] | |||
Cited in | International search | [A]US6854046 (EVANS MARC A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 15, line 57 - column 16, line 19 *; | |
[A]WO2011140673 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-19* page 2, lines 1-31 * | |||
Examination | US6073243 | ||
US2002082824 | |||
US2010162038 | |||
US2012072906 | |||
US2012072669 | |||
- Intel, "Intel Architecture Software Developer's Manual Volume 3: System Programming", (19991230), URL: http://cse.unl.edu/~goddard/Courses/CSCE351/IntelArchitecture/IntelArchitectureV3.pdf, (20200214), XP055668828 |