EP2967377 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING VITAL SIGN INFORMATION OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜHLSTEFF, Jens c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BARTULA, Marek Janusz c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BRESCH, Erik c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KAESTLE, Siegfried Walter c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
SHAN, Caifeng c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14711002.7 | 28.02.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB59322 | Priority number, date | US201361781134P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361781134 P | EP20130159124 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13159124 | US201361834909P | 14.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834909 P | EP20130172132 | 14.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13172132 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140978 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2967377 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/08, A61B5/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/0205 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/7207 (US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/1128 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/113 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/6889 (EP,US);
A61B5/721 (EP,US);
A61B5/7278 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON LEBENSZEICHENINFORMATIONEN EINER PERSON | [2016/03] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING VITAL SIGN INFORMATION OF A SUBJECT | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR OBTENIR DES INFORMATIONS DE SIGNE VITAL D'UN SUJET | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5630422 (ZANAKIS MICHAEL F [US]); | [I]WO2009124297 (KAI SENSORS INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2011127487 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2012140531 |