EP2968754 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFYING ALIGNMENT OF DRUG PUMP AND FLUID SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carefusion 303 Inc. 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDERVEEN, Timothy 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
BOLLISH, Stephen 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14712156.0 | 06.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US21403 | Priority number, date | US201313842146 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313842146 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014149897 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968754 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968754 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/168, A61M5/142 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G16H20/17 (EP);
A61M5/5086 (US);
A61M1/3644 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61M5/16827 (EP,US);
A61M5/16854 (EP,US);
A61M1/3643 (US);
A61M1/365 (US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERIFIZIEREN DER ÜBEREINSTIMMUNG EINER MEDIKAMENTENPUMPE MIT DER FLÜSSIGKEITSZUFUHR | [2017/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFYING ALIGNMENT OF DRUG PUMP AND FLUID SUPPLY | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR VÉRIFIER UN ALIGNEMENT DE POMPE DE MÉDICAMENT ET D'ALIMENTATION EN FLUIDE | [2016/03] |
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERIFIZIEREN DER AUSRICHTUNG EINER MEDIKAMENTENPUMPE UND FLÜSSIGKEITSZUFUHR | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2014 | AL | 17.01.2018 | AT | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | IT | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MK | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | RS | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | SM | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | IE | 06.03.2018 | LU | 06.03.2018 | MT | 06.03.2018 | FR | 17.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | NO | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
AL | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
FR | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
FR | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
FR | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
FR | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
FR | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006042635 (NIKLEWSKI PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0255]; figure 59 *; | [A]US2011046477 (HULVERSHORN JUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] *; | [A]WO2012094348 (CAREFUSION 303 INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0038] , [0041] * |