EP2984836 - METHOD FOR ENCODING AND METHOD FOR DECODING A LUT AND CORRESPONDING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / NL | ||
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Mr. Treublaan 7 1097 DP Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-13 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDES, Philippe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
ANDRIVON, Pierre c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
JOLLY, Emmanuel c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2024/24] |
Former [2016/07] | Lorette, Anne Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 14712249.3 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014EP55333 | Priority number, date | EP20130305453 | 08.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13305453 | EP20130306010 | 15.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13306010 | EP20140305109 | 27.01.2014 Original published format: EP 14305109 | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166705 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984836 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2984836 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/50, H04N19/30, H04N19/186, H04N19/463 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H04N19/186 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/597 (IL,US);
H04N1/6019 (RU);
H04N19/30 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/13 (KR);
H04N19/184 (KR);
H04N19/44 (IL,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,IL,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DECODIERUNG EINER LUT UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/07] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCODING AND METHOD FOR DECODING A LUT AND CORRESPONDING DEVICES | [2016/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE D'UNE TABLE DE CORRESPONDANCE ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23192629.6 / EP4254954 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0822708 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]JP2004208128 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]EP1574996 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2007242894 (KAUTZER MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [IY]EP2051529 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]); | [A]JP2010251940 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | Examination | US6281903 |