|
25.06.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2024 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
11.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
10.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
17.10.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.08.2022 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
17.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
31 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
41 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
35 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
42 |