EP2978747 - BIARYL-PROPIONIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PHARMACEUTICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUF, Sven c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
SADOWSKI, Thorsten c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
WIRTH, Klaus c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
SCHREUDER, Herman c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
BUNING, Christian c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 06 /
KALLUS, Christopher c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 07 /
STROBEL, Hartmut c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 08 /
WEHLAN, Hermut c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Essler, Frank, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Department Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14712312.9 | 26.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014EP56016 | Priority number, date | EP20130305402 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13305402 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014154727 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2978747 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2978747 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/32, C07D271/10, C07D277/30, C07D413/10, A61K31/426, A61P9/00, A61P11/08, A61P19/02, A61P23/00 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
C07D263/32 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D271/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07D277/30 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIARYL-PROPIONSÄURE-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [2016/44] | English: | BIARYL-PROPIONIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PHARMACEUTICALS | [2016/05] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE L'ACIDE PROPIONIQUE BIARYLE-ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/05] | BIARYL-PROPIONSÄURE-DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | ||
Former [2016/05] | DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE BIARYL-PROPIONIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2014 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.03.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.03.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011092187 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-9 * page 1, line 5 - line 14; claim 1 *; | [AD]WO2012101199 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-9* page 1, line 5 - line 14; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2004072802 | WO2004056815 | JP2005145839 | WO2006076202 | WO2009080226 | WO2009080227 | WO2011092187 | WO2012101197 | WO2012101199 | WO2013014204 | WO2013014205 | WO2013072327 | WO2013072328 | - A. D'AZZO ET AL., THE METABOLIC AND MOLECULAR BASES OF INHERITED DISEASE, (1995), vol. 2, pages 2835 - 2837 | - G. RUDENKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 621 - 625 | - N. J. GALJART ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 14754 - 14762 | - R. J. ROTTIER ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1998), vol. 7, pages 1787 - 1794 | - V. SEYRANTEPE ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2008), vol. 117, pages 1973 - 1981 | - M. HIRAIWA, CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (1999), vol. 56, pages 894 - 907 | - M. SAITO ET AL., INT. J. TISS. REAC., (1995), vol. 17, pages 181 - 190 | - W. L. HANNA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 153, pages 4663 - 4672 | - H. OSTROWSKA, THROMB. RES., (1997), vol. 86, pages 393 - 404 | - 0. SOHMA ET AL., PEDIATR. NEUROL., (1999), vol. 20, pages 210 - 214 | - N. M. STAMATOS ET AL., FEBS J., (2005), vol. 272, pages 2545 - 2556 | - A. HINEK, BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 377, pages 471 - 480 | - H. ITO ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 126, pages 613 - 620 | - I. HAJASHI ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 131, pages 820 - 826 | - J. CHAO ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 387, pages 665 - 75 | - MADEDDU ET AL., NAT. CLIN. PRACT. NEPHROL., (2007), vol. 3, pages 208 - 221 | - F. MARCEAU ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2004), vol. 3, pages 845 - 852 | - H. OSTROWSKA ET AL., J. CARDIOVASC. PHARMACOL., (2005), vol. 45, pages 348 - 353 | - C. PLANES ET AL., CURR. TOP. DEV. BIOL., (2007), vol. 78, pages 23 - 46 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 55, no. 17, pages 7636 - 7649 | - M. MORA, CURRENT ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2012), pages 1128 - 1150 | - W. LINZ ET AL., JRAAS (JOURNAL OF THE RENIN-ANGIOTENSIN-ALDOSTERONE SYSTEM, (2006), vol. 7, pages 155 - 161 |