EP2982115 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING OR DECODING AN IMAGE WITH INTER LAYER MOTION INFORMATION PREDICTION ACCORDING TO MOTION INFORMATION COMPRESSION SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GISQUET, Christophe 43 rue de Martin Pêcheur 35690 Acigné / FR | 02 /
ONNO, Patrice 16 allée Georges Palante F-35000 Rennes / FR | 03 /
LAROCHE, Guillaume 5 La Basse Romerais 35250 Saint Aubin d'Aubigné / FR | 04 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard 18 allée du Locar F-35890 Bourg Des Comptes / FR | [2019/19] |
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
GISQUET, Christophe 43 rue de Martin Pêcheur 35690 Acigné / FR | ||
02 /
ONNO, Patrice 16 allée Georges Palante F-35000 Rennes / FR | |||
03 /
LAROCHE, Guillaume 5 La Basse Romerais 35520 Saint Aubin d'Aubigné / FR | |||
04 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard 18 allée du Locar F-35890 Bourg Des Comptes / FR | |||
Former [2016/06] | 01 /
GISQUET, Christophe 18 avenue de Cucillé F-35000 Rennes / FR | ||
02 /
ONNO, Patrice 16 allée Georges Palante F-35000 Rennes / FR | |||
03 /
LAROCHE, Guillaume Le Haut Launay F-35520 Melesse / FR | |||
04 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard 18 allée du Locar F-35890 Bourg Des Comptes / FR | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al Canon Europe Limited European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Williamson, Brian, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2016/06] | Walker, Philip Martin Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 14712654.4 | 24.03.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014EP55862 | Priority number, date | GB20130006221 | 05.04.2013 Original published format: GB 201306221 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161740 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982115 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982115 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/463, H04N19/31 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/30 (GB,RU);
G06T9/004 (RU);
H04N19/31 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/615 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04N19/31, H04N19/463, H04N19/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG ODER DECODIERUNG EINES BILDES MIT ZWISCHENSCHICHTBEWEGUNGSINFORMATIONSVORHERSAGE NACH BEWEGUNGSINFORMATIONSKOMPRESSIONSSCHEMA | [2016/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING OR DECODING AN IMAGE WITH INTER LAYER MOTION INFORMATION PREDICTION ACCORDING TO MOTION INFORMATION COMPRESSION SCHEME | [2016/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CODER OU DÉCODER UNE IMAGE AVEC UNE PRÉDICTION D'INFORMATIONS DE MOUVEMENT INTER-COUCHE SELON UN SYSTÈME DE COMPRESSION D'INFORMATIONS DE MOUVEMENT | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19164194.3 / EP3534608 | EP20159567.5 / EP3700213 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0660615 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17* page 17, line 56 - page 18, line 3 *; | [A]US2006221418 (LEE KYO-HYUK [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]WO2012108700 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 4-7,11-14 * paragraph [0273] *; | [Y]JP2013021629 (SONY CORP) [Y] 2,4-7,9,11-14 * paragraph [0208] *; | [P]US2013308704 (PARK JOONYOUNG [KR], et al); | [P]US2014037013 (SATO KAZUSHI [JP]); | [Y] - LASSERRE S ET AL, "Description of the scalable video coding technology proposal by Canon Research Centre France", 11. JCT-VC MEETING; 102. MPEG MEETING; 10-10-2012 - 19-10-2012; SHANGHAI; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20121001), no. JCTVC-K0041, XP030112973 [Y] 1-17 * page 35 - page 47 * | [Y] - PARK S ET AL, "Modifications of temporal mv compression and temporal mv predictor", 96. MPEG MEETING; 21-3-2011 - 25-3-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20110319), no. m19567, XP030048134 [Y] 1-17 * section 3.1 * | [XP] - GISQUET C ET AL, "Non-SCE5: Position derivation for using Base Layer motion in SHVC", 13. JCT-VC MEETING; 104. MPEG MEETING; 18-4-2013 - 26-4-2013; INCHEON; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20130408), no. JCTVC-M0112, XP030114069 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * | [XP] - GISQUET C ET AL, "SCE2: Results on test 2.1", 14. JCT-VC MEETING; 25-7-2013 - 2-8-2013; VIENNA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20130715), no. JCTVC-N0139, XP030114604 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - LAROCHE G ET AL, "TE5: Results of test 5.2.6 on the Inter-Layer Motion Vector Prediction", 103. MPEG MEETING; 21-1-2013 - 25-1-2013; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20130114), no. m27429, XP030055999 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - GUILLAUME LAROCHE ET AL, "On memory compression for motion vector prediction", 96. MPEG MEETING; 21-3-2011 - 25-3-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20110316), no. m19743, XP030048310 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2012097751 | US2012189059 | US2013315313 |