|
16.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
35 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |