Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11089324 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2020107042 | 02.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514782303 | 02.10.2015 | US201816013744 | 20.06.2018 | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | US201916703133 | 04.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10582214 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2020 | B2 | US2018302644 | 18.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514782303 | 02.10.2015 | US201816013744 | 20.06.2018 | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10027975 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2018 | B2 | US2016057444 | 25.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102078103B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2020 | B1 | KR20190122884 | 30.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102078097B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2020 | B1 | KR20190122883 | 30.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102038243B | Global Dossier | 29.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180110241 | 08.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101906753B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | KR20170110178 | 10.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101814890B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2018 | B1 | KR20150140315 | 15.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6355714B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | B2 | JP2016519499 | 30.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3700213 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2022 | B1 | EP3700213 | 26.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19164194 | 24.03.2014 | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | EP14712654 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3534608 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2020 | B1 | EP3534608 | 04.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | EP14712654 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109547799 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480032319 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109510993 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480032319 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109348231 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480032319 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109246436B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B | CN109246436 | 18.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | CN201480032319 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105284117B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2018 | B | CN105284117 | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2982115 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP2982115 | 10.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015025322 | 30.07.2019 | A8 | BR112015025322 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122017024393 | 27.12.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2733110T | 27.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2982115T | 29.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | EP14712654 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3534608T | 21.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19164194 | 24.03.2014 | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | EP14712654 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2639675 | 21.12.2017 | C2 | RU2015147403 | 12.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP55862 | 24.03.2014 | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014161740 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020114013 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6701409B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | B2 | JP2019146255 | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6526292B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B2 | JP2018174547 | 08.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2803426T | 26.01.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2512829 | 27.05.2015 | B | GB2512829 | 15.10.2014 | A | GB201306221D0 | 22.05.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE045318T | 30.12.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2673277 | 23.11.2018 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2693649 | 03.07.2019 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2714364 | 14.02.2020 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2720648 | 12.05.2020 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201908304T | 21.06.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | GB201306221 | 05.04.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3534608 | EP3700213 |