EP2971062 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING VAGINAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA WASSERMANN S.p.A. Via Enrico Fermi, 1 65020 Alanno (PE) / IT | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISCOMI, Giuseppe Claudio 5 Via Ragazzi del '99 c/o Alfa Wassermann S.p.A. 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | 02 /
CALANNI, Fiorella 5 Via Ragazzi del '99 c/o Alfa Wassermann S.p.A.. 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | 03 /
VITALI, Beatrice 19/2 ViaSan Donato Dept of Pharmacy and Biotechnologies University of Bologna 40127 Bologna (BO) / IT | 04 /
CRUCIANI, Federica 19/2 Via San Donato Dept of Pharmacy and Biotechnologies University of Bologna 40127 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14712777.3 | 04.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB59427 | Priority number, date | US201361794385P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361794385 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014140995 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2971062 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, G01N33/569 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (US);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
G01N2560/00 (US);
G01N2570/00 (US);
G01N2800/26 (EP,US);
G01N2800/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 28.07.2015 | ME | 28.07.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON VAGINALINFEKTIONEN | [2016/03] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING VAGINAL INFECTIONS | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER DES INFECTIONS VAGINALES | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0547294 (ALFA WASSERMANN SPA [IT]) [X] 29 * paragraphs [0032] , [0037]; claim 12 *; | [YA]DE10241700 (MEDIFACT PUBLISHING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,4-7,10-29 * abstract * [A] 2,3,8,9; | [XY]US2007161125 (ROSENFELD RON [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * page 40, column 1 * * claim 26 * * paragraph [0165] * [Y] 1,4-7,10-29; | [XY] - SURENDRA DASARI ET AL, "Comprehensive Proteomic Analysis of Human Cervical-Vaginal Fluid", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (20070401), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1021/pr0605419, ISSN 1535-3893, pages 1258 - 1268, XP055121649 [X] 14,15 * abstract * [Y] 1,4-7,10-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/pr0605419 | [XY] - HITTI J ET AL, "Noninvasive diagnosis of intraamniotic infection: proteomic biomarkers in vaginal fluid", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, MOSBY, ST LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 203, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9378, (20100701), pages 32.e1 - 32.e8, (20100515), XP027109407 [X] 14,15 * abstract * [Y] 1,4-7,10-29 | [XAY] - SPEAR G T ET AL, "Vaginal IL-8 levels are positively associated with Candida albicans and inversely with lactobacilli in HIV-infected women", JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTIVE IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 78, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JRI.2007.11.001, ISSN 0165-0378, (20080601), pages 76 - 79, (20080219), XP022634645 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 77, paragraph 2 * [A] 2,3,8,9 [Y] 1,4-7,10-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jri.2007.11.001 | [Y] - INGER MATTSBY-BALTZER ET AL, "IL-1beta, IL-6, TNFalpha, fetal fibronectin, and endotoxin in the lower genital tract of pregnant women with bacterial vaginosis", ACTA OBSTETRICIA AND GYNECOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA., DK, (19980701), vol. 77, no. 7, doi:10.1034/j.1600-0412.1998.770701.x, ISSN 0001-6349, pages 701 - 706, XP055121904 [Y] 1,4-7,10-29 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-0412.1998.770701.x | by applicant | EP0161534 | IT1154655 | EP0547294 | EP0547292 | US6140355 | WO2005044823 | US7045620 | WO2006094662 | EP1557421 | WO2008155728 | EP1676847 | EP1676848 | WO2009108730 | US2009312357 | US7902206 | US7923553 | WO2011153444 | WO2011156897 | US8158781 | US8158644 | US8173801 | US8193196 | US8217054 | - "Rifaximin", The Merck Index, XIII ed.,, page 8304 | - The Merck Index XIII ed., MERCK AND CO.,, page 8301 | - VISCOMI G. ET AL., CRYST. ENG COMM., (2008), vol. 10, pages 1074 - 1081 | - DESCOMBE J. J. ET AL., INT. J. CLIN. PHARMACOL. RES., (1994), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 51 - 56 | - SIMOES JA ET AL., INFECT. DIS. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (2001), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 41 - 45 | - DEBBIA A. ET AL., J CHEMOTHER, (2008), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 186 - 194 | - AMSEL R. ET AL., AM J MED, (1983), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 14 - 22 | - NUGENT RP ET AL., J CLIN MICROBIOL, (1991), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 297 - 301 | - ZHOU X ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 150, pages 2565 - 2573 | - APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 3575 - 3581 | - DASARI S. ET AL., J PROTEOME RES, (2007), vol. 6, pages 1258 - 68 | - ZEGELS ET AL., PROTEOME SCI, (2010), vol. 8, page 63 | - BIGELOW, HUM REPROD, (2004), vol. 19, pages 884 - 92 |