EP2986954 - SYSTEM AND METHOD TO MEASURE VOLUME FRACTION IN MULTIPHASE FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BL Technologies, Inc. 5951 Clearwater Drive Minnetonka, MN 55341 / US | [2019/04] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SURMAN, Cheryl, Margaret General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3a59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
MORRIS, William, Guy General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3a59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
DIERINGER, Jon, Albert General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3a59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Fonquernie, Sophie Benedicte, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Lee, Brenda GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14712985.2 | 07.03.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014US21826 | Priority number, date | US201313862644 | 15.04.2013 Original published format: US201313862644 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014172028 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986954 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
G01F23/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN EINES VOLUMENANTEILS IN MEHRPHASIGEN FLUIDEN | [2016/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO MEASURE VOLUME FRACTION IN MULTIPHASE FLUIDS | [2016/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER UNE FRACTION DE VOLUME DANS DES FLUIDES MULTIPHASES | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 20.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 21.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO0107874 (FORINNOVA AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,12 * figures 1,2,5,6 * * page 7, line 10 - line 25 * * page 8, line 15 - line 19 * * page 10, line 1 - line 9 * * page 10, line 29 - line 31 * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 2 * * claim 15 * [Y] 19 [I] 6,10,11,13-20; | [Y]US4887798 (JULIUS EDMUND [DE]) [Y] 19 * figure 4 *; | [A]GB2486786 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 10,20 * abstract * | Examination | US2010295558 | WO9713122 | by applicant | US20100958656 |