EP3047175 - MULTI-STEP AUTOMATIC GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUPT, Josef Alpenblickstrasse 48 88069 Tettnang / DE | 02 /
BREHMER, Martin Altmannstrasse 20 88069 Tettnang / DE | 03 /
MARGRAF, Christoph In den Auwiesen 44 88677 Markdorf / DE | 04 /
BECK, Stefan Brucknerstrasse 3 88097 Eriskirch / DE | 05 /
SIBLA, Christian Oberhofstrasse 54 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | ZF Friedrichshafen AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Löwentalerstraße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14713405.0 | 19.03.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014EP55460 | Priority number, date | DE201310218941 | 20.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013218941 | DE201310225770 | 12.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013225770 | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015039768 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047175 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/66 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
F16H3/66 (EP,US);
F16H3/666 (EP,US);
F16H2003/445 (US);
F16H2003/447 (US);
F16H2200/0065 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0069 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2012 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2046 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFEN-AUTOMATGETRIEBE | [2016/30] | English: | MULTI-STEP AUTOMATIC GEARBOX | [2016/30] | French: | BOÎTE DE VITESSES AUTOMATIQUE À PLUSIEURS RAPPORTS | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/46] | 29.09.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/46] | Appeal following examination | 17.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T0190/20 | 17.12.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102005002337 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-43 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE102007055808 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-43 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102009001253 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-43 * figures 1,15 *; | [A]WO2011026833 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-43 * figures 1-4,11 *; | [A]DE102010040002 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-43 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2007006449 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-43 * figures 2,3,1 *; | [A]DE102009005648 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-43 * figures 2,3 * |