EP2970321 - BUPRENORPHINE ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Pharma LP One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEHRING, Richard, R. 2348 County Road 229 D Henderson, Texas 75652 / US | 02 /
TAFESSE, Laykea 8 Windward Way Robbinsville, NJ 08690 / US | 03 /
YAO, Jiangchao 10 Bellflower Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
GOEHRING, Richard, R. 525 Aspen Woods Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | ||
02 /
TAFESSE, Laykea 8 Windward Way Robbinsville, NJ 08690 / US | |||
03 /
YAO, Jiangchao 10 Bellflower Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Representative(s) | Braun, Nils Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Braun, Nils Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/03] | Braun, Nils Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14713577.6 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB00394 | Priority number, date | US201361786997P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361786997 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014140784 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2970321 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970321 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D489/12, A61K31/485, A61P25/04 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07D489/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,US);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D489/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 15.10.2015 | ME | 15.10.2015 | Title | German: | BUPRENORPHIN-ANALOGA | [2016/03] | English: | BUPRENORPHINE ANALOGS | [2016/03] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LA BUPRÉNORPHINE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 27.06.2018 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | GB | 14.03.2019 | IE | 14.03.2019 | LU | 14.03.2019 | MT | 14.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012038813 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,14-43,46-76,83-103 * claim 1; compounds 29,30,81 *; | [X] - DERRICK I ET AL, "Cinnamoyl derivatives of 7alpha-amino- and 7alpha-(aminomethyl)-N-(cyclopropylmethyl)-6,14-endo-ethanotetrahydronororipavines are high-potency opioid antagonists", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (20000101), vol. 83, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 3122 - 3130, XP002666946 [X] 1-9,11,14-43,46-76,83-103 * compounds 4d,5d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1522-2675(20001220)83:12<3122::AID-HLCA3122>3.3.CO;2-U | [X] - HUMPHREY A. MOYNIHAN ET AL, "Fumaroylamino-4,5-epoxymorphinans and Related Opioids with Irreversible [mu] Opioid Receptor Antagonist Effects", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20121126), vol. 55, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jm301096s, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 9868 - 9874, XP055127464 [X] 1-9,11,14-43,46-76,83-103 * compounds 4a,5a,6a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm301096s | [X] - DAVID RENNISON ET AL, "Cinnamoyl derivatives of 7alpha-aminomethyl-6,14-endo-ethanotetrahydrothebaine and 7alpha-aminomethyl-6,14-endo-ethanotetrahydrooripavine and related opioid ligands", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 50, no. 21, doi:10.1021/JM070255O, ISSN 0022-2623, (20070101), pages 5176 - 5182, (20070922), XP002666945 [X] 1-9,11,14-43,46-76,83-103 * compounds 4a,5a,6a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM070255O | Examination | - PAOLA CIAPETTI AND BRUNO GIETHLEN ED - CAMILLE GEORGES WERMUTH, Chapter 15 - Molecular Variations Based on Isosteric Replacements, THE PRACTICE OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY (THIRD EDITION), ELSEVIER, NL, PAGE(S) 290 - 342, (20080101), ISBN 978-0-12-374194-3, XP009142466 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-374194-3.00015-9 | by applicant | WO9948492 | WO9854168 | US2011136846 | US5698155 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US3536809 | US3598123 | US4008719 | US5674533 | US5059595 | US5591767 | US5120548 | US5073543 | US5639476 | US5354556 | US5733566 | US6136839 | - K.M. FOLEY; PAIN, Cecil Textbook ofmedicine, (1996), pages 100 - 107 | - GUTSTEIN; HOWARD B.; AKIL; HUDA, Opioid Analgesics | - BRUNTON, LL; LAZO, JS; PARKER, KL; GOODMAN; GILMAN'S, The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics | - BRUNTON LL; LAZO JS; PARKER KL, The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics | - C. ALTIER ET AL., "ORL-1 I receptor-mediated internalization of N-type calcium channels", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, (2005), vol. 9, page 31 | - D. BARLOCCO ET AL., "The opioid-receptor-like 1 (ORL-1) as a potential target for new analgesics", EUR. J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1016/S0223-5234(00)00126-4, page 275, XP004341231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(00)00126-4 | - J.S. MOGIL ET AL., "Orphanin FQ is a functional anti-opioid peptide", NEUROSCI., (1996), vol. 75, page 333 | - K. LUTFY ET AL., "Tolerance develops to the inhibitory effect of orphanin FQ on morphine- induced antinociception in the rat", NEUROREPORT, (1999), vol. 10, page 103 | - M.M. MORGAN ET AL., "Antinociception mediated by the periaqueductal gray is attenuated by orphanin FQ", NEUROREPORT, (1997), vol. 8, page 3431 | - J. TIAN ET AL., "Involvement of endogenous Orphanin FQ in electroacupuncture- induced analgesia", NEUROREPORT, (1997), vol. 8, page 497 | - J. TIAN ET AL., "Functional studies using antibodies against orphanin FQ/nociceptin", PEPTIDES, (2000), vol. 21, page 1047 | - H. UEDA ET AL., "Enhanced Spinal Nociceptin Receptor Expression Develops Morphine Tolerance and Dependence", J NEUROSCI., (2000), vol. 20, page 7640 | - S. WNENDT ET AL., "Agonistic effect of buprenorphine in a nociceptin/OFQ receptor-triggered reporter gene assay", MOLEC. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 56, pages 334 - 338, XP000872534 | - HAWKINSON ET AL., "Opioid activity profiles indicate similarities between the nociceptin/orphanin FQ and opioid receptors", EUR. J PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 389, pages 107 - 114 | - K. LUTFY ET AL., "Buprenorphine-induced antinociception is mediated by p-opioid receptors and compromised by concomitant activation of opioid receptor-like receptors", J NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 23, pages 10331 - 10337 | - PERGOLIZZI ET AL., "Opioids and the Management of Chronic Severe Pain in the Elderly: Consensus Statement of an International Expert Panel with Focus on the Six Clinically Most Often Used World Health Organization step IB Opioids (buprenorphine, Fentanyl, Hydromorphone, Methadone, Morphine, Oxycodone", PAIN PRACTICE, (2008), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 287 - 313 | - TZSCHENTIKE, "Behavioral pharmacology of buprenorphine, with a focus on preclinical models of reward and addiction", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 161, pages 1 - 16 | - WOOD; GALLIGAN, "Function of opioids in the enteric nervous system", NEUROGASTROENTEROLOGY & MOTILITY, (2004), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 17 - 28 | - SHINKAI ET AL., "4-aminoquinolines: Novel nociceptin antagonists with analgesic activity", J MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 4667 - 4677 | - KAWAMOTO ET AL., "Discovery of the first potent and selective small molecule opioid receptor-like (ORL-1) antagonist: 1-[(3R,4R)-1-cyclooctylmethyl-3-hydroxymethyl-4-piperidyl]-3-cthyl-1,3-dihydro-2H-benzimidazol-2-one (J-113397", J. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 5061 - 6063 | - GRUPP ET AL., J. MOL, CELL CARDIOL., (1999), vol. 31, pages 297 - 303 | - M. CAIRA ET AL., J PHARMACEUT. SCI., (2004), vol. 93, no. 3, pages 601 - 611 | - E.C. VAN TONDER ET AL., AAPS PHARM. SCI. TECH., (2004), vol. 5, no. 1 | - A.L. BINGHAM ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2001), pages 603 - 604 | - ROSS; KENAKIN, Pharmacodynamics: Mechanisms of Drug Action and the Relationship Between Drug Concentration and Effect, pages 31 - 32 | - FILER, Isotopes in the Physical and Biomedical Sciences, Vol. 1, Labeled Compounds, (1987), vol. 1 | - LEVINE, S. J, J AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1958), vol. 80, page 6150 | - F.E. D'AMOUR ET AL., "A Method for Determining Loss of Pain Sensation", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1941), vol. 72, pages 74 - 79 | - G. WOOLFE; A.D. MACDONALD, J PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1944), vol. 80, pages 300 - 307 | - L. BARTHO ET AL., "Involvement of Capsaicin-sensitive Neurones in Hyperalgesia and Enhanced Opioid Antinociception in Inflammation", NATINYN-SCHMIEDEBERG'S ARCHIVES OFPHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 342, pages 666 - 670 | - Z. SELTZER ET AL., "A Novel Behavioral Model of Neuropathic Pain Disorders Produced in Rats by Partial Sciatic Nerve Injury", PAIN, (1990), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(90)91074-S, pages 205 - 218, XP024377631 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(90)91074-S | - S.H. KIM, "An Experimental Model for Peripheral Neuropathy Produced by Segmental Spinal Nerve Ligation in the Rat", PAIN, (1992), vol. 50, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(92)90041-9, pages 355 - 363, XP024378108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(92)90041-9 | - C. STEIN, "Unilateral Inflammation of the Hindpaw in Rats as a Model of Prolonged Noxious Stimulation: Alterations in Behavior and Nociceptive Thresholds", PHARMACOL. BIOCHEM. AND BEHAVIOR, (1988), vol. 31, pages 451 - 455 | - K. HARGREAVES, "A New and Sensitive Method for Measuring Thermal Nociception in Cutaneous Hyperalgesia", PAIN, (1988), vol. 32, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(88)90026-7, pages 77 - 88, XP024378083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(88)90026-7 | - D. TORBATI ET AL., INTENSIVE CARE MED., (2000), vol. 26, pages 585 - 591 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (1995), pages 1447 - 1676 | - Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, MARCEL DEKKER, INC | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING, (1980), pages 1553 - 1593 | - Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Disperse Systems, MARCEL DEKKER, INC | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - TREAT ET AL., LIPOSOMES IN THE THERAPY OFLNFECTIOUS DISEASE AND CANCER, (1989), pages 317 - 327,353-365 | - "Dental Applications", GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, CRC PRESS, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - RANGER; PEPPAS, J MACRORNOL. SCI. REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61 | - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, page 190 | - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, page 351 | - HOWARD ET AL., J NEUROSURG., (1989), vol. 11, page 105 | - "Analgesic-Antipyretic and Anti-inflammatory Agents and Drugs Employed in the Treatment of Gout", PAUL A. INSEL, Goodman & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1996), pages 617 - 57 | - "Analgesic, Antipyretic and Anti-Inflammatory Drugs", GLEN R. HANSON, Rernington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, (1995), vol. IA, pages 1196 - 1221 |