EP2968004 - SYSTEMS FOR PROVIDING ANATOMICAL FLAP CENTRATION FOR AN OPHTHALMIC LASER TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING ANATOMICAL FLAP CENTRATION FOR AN OPHTHALMIC LASER TREATMENT SYSTEM | ||
[2022/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMO Development, LLC 1700 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | [2022/27] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states AMO Development, LLC 1700 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWNELL, Michael, F. 99 Via Sonrisa San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | 02 /
PATTERSON, Kimberley, N. 32742 Brookseed Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US | 03 /
DE GUZMAN, Peter-Patrick 1434 N. Kathleen Lane Orange, CA 92867 / US | 04 /
KARDOS, Victor, J. 25 Delano Irvine, CA 92602 / US | 05 /
LEE HON, M. 8 Bramford Street Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/27] |
Former [2016/03] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14713648.5 | 03.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US19954 | Priority number, date | US201361789664P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789664 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014149625 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968004 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968004 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/008 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61F9/00836 (EP,US);
A61F9/00802 (US);
A61F9/00825 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00846 (US);
A61F2009/00853 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR ANATOMISCHE KLAPPENZENTRIERUNG FÜR EIN AUGENLASERBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/07] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR PROVIDING ANATOMICAL FLAP CENTRATION FOR AN OPHTHALMIC LASER TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2022/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR PRODUIRE UN CENTRAGE DE VOLET ANATOMIQUE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT LASER OPHTALMIQUE | [2022/07] |
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ANATOMISCHE KLAPPENZENTRIERUNG FÜR EIN AUGENLASERBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING ANATOMICAL FLAP CENTRATION FOR AN OPHTHALMIC LASER TREATMENT SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/03] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PRODUIRE UN CENTRAGE DE VOLET ANATOMIQUE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT LASER OPHTALMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22178366.5 / EP4088695 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2021 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | ES | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | GB | 03.03.2023 | IE | 03.03.2023 | LU | 03.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | NL | 01.04.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
GB | 03.03.2023 | ||
IE | 03.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
GB | 03.03.2023 | ||
IE | 03.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009033111 (LENSX LASERS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2009069794 (KURTZ RONALD M [US]); | [Y]US2009247997 (WATANABE KEITH [US], et al); | [XY]WO2010112041 (WAVELIGHT GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4665913 | US4669466 | US4732148 | US4764930 | US4770172 | US4773414 | US5108388 | US5163934 | US5207668 | US5219343 | US5646791 | US5966197 | US5993438 | US6253476 | US6254595 | US6283954 | US6367931 | USD462442S | US6863667 | US7351241 | US7431457 | US7480396 |