EP2964176 - OUTER COVERS AND DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT INSERTS FOR PANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Samantha Chen-Yee One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
ROE, Donald Carroll One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Heide, Ute Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Heide, Ute Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 14714019.8 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014US20843 | Priority number, date | US201313789735 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US201313789735 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014138274 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2964176 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F13/505 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
A61F13/49006 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/49003 (CN,US);
A61F13/4906 (US);
A61F13/49011 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/4902 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/496 (US);
A61F13/505 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Title | German: | AUSSENHÜLLE UND WEGWERFBARE SAUGFÄHIGE EINLAGEN FÜR HOSEN | [2016/02] | English: | OUTER COVERS AND DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT INSERTS FOR PANTS | [2016/02] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS COUVRANTS EXTERNES ET GARNITURES ABSORBANTES JETABLES POUR SOUS-VÊTEMENTS | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 13.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 26.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2008119816 (CARSTENS JERRY EDWARD [US]) [XD] 1-15 * figures 1-19 * * page 1, paragraphs 4-8 * * page 3, paragraphs 57-59 * * page 4, paragraphs 63-65 *; | [XD]US2010179503 (ROE DONALD CARROLL [US], et al) [XD] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph 30 - page 4, paragraph 33 *; | [XD]US2010179495 (ROE DONALD CARROLL [US]) [XD] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraphs 9-11 * * page 3, paragraphs 24-27 *; | [X]US2012022491 (ROE DONALD CARROLL [US]) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2013006207 (ROE DONALD CARROLL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 2 * * page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 3, paragraph 30 * * claims 1-20 * | by applicant | US3860003 | US4597760 | US4808178 | US5021051 | US5518801 | US5624425 | US5769838 | US5906603 | US5911713 | US6207738 | US6251097 | US6278037 | US6420627 | US6432098 | US2002169431 | US6514362 | US2003088220 | US2003119641 | US2003233082 | US6669618 | US2004023771 | US6786895 | US6878647 | US6884494 | US6890872 | US6893388 | US6905987 | US2005130821 | US2005164587 | US6936039 | US2005215971 | US2005215970 | US2005234419 | US6964720 | US7060149 | US7211531 | US7223818 | US2007203301 | US2007239130 | US2007249254 | US2007287983 | US2007287348 | US2007293111 | US2008045917 | US2008119813 | US2008119814 | US2008119815 | US2008119816 | US2008312617 | US2008312618 | US2008312628 | US2008312619 | US2008312620 | US2008312621 | US2008312622 | US2008312625 | US2008312624 | US2008319407 | US7695463 | US2010179495 | US2010179503 | US7771406 | US7771408 | US2011024940 | US2011172628 | US8002760 | US8016803 | US8017827 | US8158043 | US2012277713 | US2012277702 |