EP2964760 - CELLOBIOHYDROLASE VARIANTS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | For all designated states Novozymes, Inc. 1445 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORCH, Kim Vandtårnsvej 18 3460 Birkerød / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Kenneth Bavnager 232 3310 Oelsted / DK | 03 /
KROGH, Kristian Klirevaenget 35 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 04 /
MCBRAYER, Brett 3712 Kos Island Avenue Sacramento, California 95834 / US | 05 /
WESTH, Peter Amagerbrogade 28 4.TH 2300 Copenhagen / DK | 06 /
KARI, Jeppe Fordresgårdvej 13 2400 Copenhagen / DK | 07 /
OLSEN, Johan Brynhildegade 8 st.tv. 2200 Copenhagen / DK | 08 /
SØRENSEN, Trine Boyesgade 5B 5 tv 1622 Copenhagen / DK | 09 /
WINDAHL, Michael Møebjergvej 14 3660 Stenløse / DK | 10 /
XU, Hui 3121 Gross Avenue Wake Forest, North Carolina 27587 / US | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2021/19] |
Former [2016/02] | Hansen, Lars Hallander Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK | Application number, filing date | 14714073.5 | 07.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014US22068 | Priority number, date | US201361775153P | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361775153 P | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014138672 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2964760 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2964760 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/42, C12N15/82, C12P19/02, C12P19/14 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12N15/8246 (EP,US);
C12N15/8257 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (US);
C12P19/14 (US);
C12P2203/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/02] | C12N9/42, C12N15/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CELLOBIOHYDROLASEVARIANTEN UND POLYNUKLEOTIDE ZUR CODIERUNG DAVON | [2016/02] | English: | CELLOBIOHYDROLASE VARIANTS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME | [2016/02] | French: | VARIANTES DE CELLOBIOHYDROLASE ET POLYNUCLÉOTIDES CODANT POUR CELLES-CI | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2017/04] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2014 | AL | 12.05.2021 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | ES | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 07.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2357227 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * mutant 168, seq id no 12 has A at poition 200; paragraph [[0088]]; claim 7 * | International search | [X]WO2010141779 (DANISCO US INC [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 153; figure 13; claim 3; tables 7-1 *; | [X]US2003170861 (ADNEY WILLIAM S [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0066] *; | [XP]US2013244292 (POLAND JOHN [US], et al) [XP] 1-21 * claim 13 * | Examination | EP2357227 | by applicant | WO2011050037 | WO2005028636 | WO2005001065 | WO2004016760 | US7375197 | WO02095014 | WO2005002863 | US2004171154 | WO9517413 | WO9522625 | US5223409 | WO9206204 | WO9943835 | WO9600787 | WO0056900 | US6011147 | WO9425612 | WO9533836 | WO2010039889 | WO0024883 | EP0238023 | WO9015861 | WO2010096673 | US2002164730 | WO2006110891 | WO2006110899 | WO2006110900 | WO2006110901 | WO2006032282 | WO9117243 | WO9117244 | WO9105039 | WO9315186 | US5275944 | WO9602551 | US5536655 | WO0070031 | WO2005093050 | WO2012062220 | WO2011059740 | WO2013028928 | WO2009042871 | WO2010141325 | WO2006074435 | WO2010057086 | WO2005047499 | WO2007019442 | WO2010088387 | WO2011035029 | WO2008057637 | WO9813465 | WO9815619 | WO9815633 | WO9906574 | WO9910481 | WO9925847 | WO9931255 | WO02101078 | WO03027306 | WO03052054 | WO03052055 | WO03052056 | WO03052057 | WO03052118 | WO2004043980 | WO2004048592 | WO2005093073 | WO2006074005 | WO2006117432 | WO2007071818 | WO2007071820 | WO2008008070 | WO2008008793 | US5457046 | US5648263 | US5686593 | WO2005074647 | WO2008148131 | WO2011035027 | WO2005074656 | WO2010065830 | WO2007089290 | WO2012149344 | WO2009085935 | WO2009085859 | WO2009085864 | WO2009085868 | WO2009033071 | WO2010138754 | WO2011005867 | WO2011039319 | WO2011041397 | WO2012000892 | WO2011041504 | WO2012125925 | WO2012113340 | WO2012129699 | WO2012130964 | WO2012122477 | WO2012135659 | WO2012146171 | WO2012101206 | WO2012129697 | WO2012130950 | WO2008151043 | WO2012021394 | WO2012021395 | WO2012021396 | WO2012021399 | WO2012021400 | WO2012021401 | WO2012021408 | WO2012021410 | WO9421785 | WO2006078256 | WO2011041405 | WO2010126772 | WO2009079210 | WO2011057083 | WO2010108918 | WO2009073709 | WO2005001036 | WO2010014880 | WO2009042846 | WO2009076122 | WO2009127729 | WO2010053838 | WO2010065448 | WO2006114094 | WO2009073383 | WO2010014706 | WO2009068565 | WO03062430 | WO9114772 | US6395966 | US7151204 | WO0240694 | WO2005042735 | WO2004032648 | EP0238023 | WO2011057140 | WO0039322 | WO2012044915 | WO03070956 | WO2011123450 | - DE VRIES, J. BACTERIOL., (1998), vol. 180, pages 243 - 249 | - VENTURI ET AL., J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 42, pages 55 - 66 | - BORASTON ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2004), vol. 383, pages 769 - 781 | - TEERI, TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, pages 160 - 167 | - TEERI ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (1998), vol. 26, pages 173 - 178 | - LEVER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 47, pages 273 - 279 | - VAN TILBEURGH ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1982), vol. 149, pages 152 - 156 | - VAN TILBEURGH; CLAEYSSENS, FEBS LETTERS, (1985), vol. 187, pages 283 - 288 | - TOMME ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 170, pages 575 - 581 | - ZHANG ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, (2006), vol. 24, pages 452 - 481 | - GHOSE, PURE APPL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 59, pages 257 - 68 | - WISELOGEL ET AL., Handbook on Bioethanol, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1995), pages 105 - 118 | - WYMAN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 50, pages 3 - 16 | - LYND, APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 24-25, pages 695 - 719 | - "Recent Progress in Bioconversion of Lignocellulosics", MOSIER ET AL., Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 23 - 40 | - GHOSE, PURE AND APPL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 59, pages 257 - 268 | - HENRISSAT, BIOCHEM. J., (1991), vol. 280, pages 309 - 316 | - HENRISSAT; BAIROCH, BIOCHEM. J., (1996), vol. 316, pages 695 - 696 | - QUINLAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2011), vol. 208, pages 15079 - 15084 | - PHILLIPS ET AL., ACS CHEM. BIOL., (2011), vol. 6, pages 1399 - 1406 | - LIN ET AL., STRUCTURE, (2012), vol. 20, pages 1051 - 1061 | - SHALLOM; SHOHAM, CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 219 - 228 | - GHOSE; BISARIA, PURE & APPL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 59, pages 1739 - 1752 | - BENDTSEN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 340, pages 783 - 795 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - RICE ET AL., "EMBOSS: The European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", TRENDS GENET., (2000), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2, pages 276 - 277, XP004200114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2 | - EBRINGEROVA ET AL., ADV. POLYM. SCI., (2005), vol. 186, pages 1 - 67 | - BIELY; PUCHARD, JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2006), vol. 86, no. 11, pages 1636 - 1647 | - SPANIKOVA; BIELY, FEBS LETTERS, (2006), vol. 580, no. 19, pages 4597 - 4601 | - HERRIMANN ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 321, pages 375 - 381 | - BAILEY, "Interlaboratory testing of methods for assay of xylanase activity", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-1656(92)90074-J, pages 257 - 270, XP023704921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(92)90074-J | - LEVER, ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1972), vol. 47, pages 273 - 279 | - EDGAR, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, pages 1792 - 1797 | - KATOH; KUMA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 30, pages 3059 - 3066 | - KATOH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 33, pages 511 - 518 | - KATOH; TOH, BIOINFORMATICS, (2007), vol. 23, pages 372 - 374 | - KATOH ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 537, pages 39 - 64 | - KATOH; TOH, BIOINFORMATICS, (2010), vol. 26, pages 1899 - 1900 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - LINDAHL; ELOFSSON, J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 295, pages 613 - 615 | - ATSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - JONES, J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 287, pages 797 - 815 | - MCGUFFIN; JONES, BIOINFORMATICS, (2003), vol. 19, pages 874 - 881 | - GOUGH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 313, pages 903 - 919 | - HOLM; SANDER, PROTEINS, (1998), vol. 33, pages 88 - 96 | - SHINDYALOV; BOURNE, PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1998), vol. 11, pages 739 - 747 | - HOLM; PARK, BIOINFORMATICS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 566 - 567 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - HILTON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 4699 - 4708 | - DE VOS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - SMITH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - WLODAVER ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1992), vol. 309, pages 59 - 64 | - COOPER ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 2575 - 2583 | - DAWSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 776 - 779 | - MARTIN ET AL., J. IND. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 3, pages 568 - 576 | - SVETINA ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 76, pages 245 - 251 | - RASMUSSEN-WILSON ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 63, pages 3488 - 3493 | - WARD ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 498 - 503 | - CONTRERAS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 378 - 381 | - EATON ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, pages 505 - 512 | - COLLINS-RACIE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 982 - 987 | - CARTER ET AL., PROTEINS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND GENETICS, (1989), vol. 6, pages 240 - 248 | - STEVENS, DRUG DISCOVERY WORLD, (2003), vol. 4, pages 35 - 48 | - SCHERER; DAVIS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 4949 - 4955 | - BARTON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 7349 - 4966 | - STORICI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 773 - 776 | - KREN, NAT. MED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 285 - 290 | - CALISSANO; MACINO, FUNGAL GENET. NEWSLETT., (1996), vol. 43, pages 15 - 16 | - PARIKH; MATSUMURA, J. MOL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 352, pages 621 - 628 | - TIAN ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 1050 - 1054 | - REIDHAAR-OLSON; SAUER, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 53 - 57 | - BOWIE; SAUER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2152 - 2156 | - LOWMAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10837 | - DERBYSHIRE ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 46, page 145 | - NER ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, page 127 | - NESS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 17, pages 893 - 896 | - AGAISSE; LERECLUS, MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 13, pages 97 - 107 | - EGON ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315 | - VILLA-KAMAROFF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - GILBERT ET AL., "Useful proteins from recombinant bacteria", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1980), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - ROMANOS ET AL., YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, pages 423 - 488 | - HUE ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 177, pages 3465 - 3471 | - GUO; SHERMAN, MOL. CELLULAR BIOL., (1995), vol. 15, pages 5983 - 5990 | - SIMONEN; PALVA, MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1993), vol. 57, pages 109 - 137 | - GEMS ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 98, pages 61 - 67 | - CULLEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 9163 - 9175 | - CHANG; COHEN, MOL. GEN. GENET., (1979), vol. 168, pages 111 - 115 | - YOUNG; SPIZIZEN, J. BACTERIOL., (1961), vol. 81, pages 823 - 829 | - DUBNAU; DAVIDOFF-ABELSON, J. MOL. BIOL., (1971), vol. 56, pages 209 - 221 | - SHIGEKAWA; DOWER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 742 - 751 | - KOEHLER; THORNE, J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 5271 - 5278 | - HANAHAN, J. MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 166, pages 557 - 580 | - DOWER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 6127 - 6145 | - GONG, FOLIA MICROBIOL. (PRAHA, (2004), vol. 49, pages 399 - 405 | - MAZODIER ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 3583 - 3585 | - BURKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 6289 - 6294 | - CHOI ET AL., J. MICROBIOL. METHODS, (2006), vol. 64, pages 391 - 397 | - PINEDO; SMETS, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 71, pages 51 - 57 | - PERRY; KURAMITSU, INFECT. IMMUN., (1981), vol. 32, pages 1295 - 1297 | - CATT; JOLLICK, MICROBIOS, (1991), vol. 68, pages 189 - 207 | - BUCKLEY ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 3800 - 3804 | - CLEWELL, MICROBIOL. REV., vol. 45, pages 409 - 436 | - YELTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1419 - 1422 | - MALARDIER ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 78, pages 147 - 156 | - "Guide to Yeast Genetics and Molecular Biology", BECKER; GUARENTE, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., vol. 194, pages 182 - 187 | - ITO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 153, page 163 | - HINNEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 1920 | - "Cellulose bioconversion technology", PHILIPPIDIS, G. P., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1996), pages 179 - 212 | - SHEEHAN; HIMMEL, BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1999), vol. 15, pages 817 - 827 | - LYND ET AL., MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 66, pages 506 - 577 | - DE CASTILHOS CORAZZA ET AL., ACTA SCIENTIARUM. TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 25, pages 33 - 38 | - GUSAKOV; SINITSYN, ENZ. MICROB. TECHNOL., (1985), vol. 7, pages 346 - 352 | - RYU; LEE, BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1983), vol. 25, pages 53 - 65 | - CHANDRA ET AL., ADV. BIOCHEM. ENGIN.LBIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 108, pages 67 - 93 | - GALBE; ZACCHI, ADV. BIOCHEM. ENGIN.LBIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 108, pages 41 - 65 | - HENDRIKS; ZEEMAN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2009), vol. 100, pages 10 - 18 | - MOSIER ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 96, pages 673 - 686 | - TAHERZADEH; KARIMI, INT. J. MOL. SCI., (2008), vol. 9, pages 1621 - 1651 | - YANG; WYMAN, BIOFUELS BIOPRODUCTS AND BIOREFINING-BIOFPR., (2008), vol. 2, pages 26 - 40 | - DUFF; MURRAY, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 855, pages 1 - 33 | - GALBE; ZACCHI, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 59, pages 618 - 628 | - BALLESTEROS ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 129-132, pages 496 - 508 | - VARGA ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 113-116, pages 509 - 523 | - SASSNER ET AL., ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 39, pages 756 - 762 | - SCHELL, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 91, pages 179 - 188 | - LEE ET AL., ADV. BIOCHEM. ENG. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 93 - 115 | - WYMAN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 96, pages 1959 - 1966 | - SCHMIDT; THOMSEN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (1998), vol. 64, pages 139 - 151 | - PALONEN ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 117, pages 1 - 17 | - VARGA, BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2004), vol. 88, pages 567 - 574 | - MARTIN, J. CHEM. TECHNOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 81, pages 1669 - 1677 | - GOLLAPALLI, APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 98, pages 23 - 35 | - CHUNDAWAT, BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2007), vol. 96, pages 219 - 231 | - ALIZADEH, APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 121, pages 1133 - 1141 | - TEYMOURI, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 96, pages 2014 - 2018 | - PAN, BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2005), vol. 90, pages 473 - 481 | - PAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2006), vol. 94, pages 851 - 861 | - KURABI ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 121, pages 219 - 230 | - SCHELL, APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 105-108, pages 69 - 85 | - MOSIER ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 96, pages 673 - 686 | - HSU, T.-A., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1996), pages 179 - 212 | - GHOSH; SINGH, ADV. APPL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 39, pages 295 - 333 | - "Ethanol production from renewable resources", GONG, C. S.; CAO, N. J.; DU, J.; TSAO, G. T., Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 207 - 241 | - OLSSON; HAHN-HAGERDAL, ENZ. MICROB. TECH., (1996), vol. 18, pages 312 - 331 | - VALLANDER; ERIKSSON, ADV. BIOCHEM. ENG.LBIOTECHNOL., (1990), vol. 42, pages 63 - 95 | - SAARILAHTI ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 90, pages 9 - 14 | - PENTTILA ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 45, pages 253 - 263 | - SALOHEIMO ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 63, pages 11 - 22 | - OKADA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 64, pages 555 - 563 | - SALOHEIMO ET AL., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 13, pages 219 - 228 | - OOI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 18, page 5884 | - SAKAMOTO ET AL., CURRENT GENETICS, (1995), vol. 27, pages 435 - 439 | - KAWAGUCHI ET AL., GENE, (1996), vol. 173, pages 287 - 288 | - DAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 4973 - 4980 | - LIN, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 69, pages 627 - 642 | - CHEN; HO, APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 39-40, pages 135 - 147 | - HO ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 64, pages 1852 - 1859 | - KOTTER; CIRIACY, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 38, pages 776 - 783 | - WALFRIDSSON ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 61, pages 4184 - 4190 | - KUYPER ET AL., FEMS YEAST RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 4, pages 655 - 664 | - BEALL ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENG., (1991), vol. 38, pages 296 - 303 | - INGRAM ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 58, pages 204 - 214 | - ZHANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 240 - 243 | - DEANDA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 62, pages 4465 - 4470 | - "Ethanol production from renewable resources", GONG ET AL., Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 207 - 241 | - SILVEIRA; JONAS, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 59, pages 400 - 408 | - NIGAM; SINGH, PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 117 - 124 | - EZEJI ET AL., WORLD JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 595 - 603 | - RICHARD; MARGARITIS, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2004), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 501 - 515 | - KATAOKA ET AL., WATER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 36, no. 6-7, pages 41 - 47 | - GUNASEELAN, BIOMASS AND BIOENERGY, (1997), vol. 13, no. 1-2, pages 83 - 114 | - CHEN; LEE; 1997, APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., vol. 63-65, pages 435 - 448 | - STICKLEN, NATURE REVIEWS, (2008), vol. 9, pages 433 - 443 | - TAGUE ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 86, page 506 | - FRANCK ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 21, pages 285 - 294 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689 | - ZHANG ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1991), vol. 3, pages 1155 - 1165 | - EDWARDS; CORUZZI, ANN. REV. GENET., (1990), vol. 24, pages 275 - 303 | - ITO ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 863 - 878 | - WU ET AL., PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 39, pages 885 - 889 | - CONRAD ET AL., J. PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 152, pages 708 - 711 | - CHEN ET AL., PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 39, pages 935 - 941 | - KYOZUKA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 102, pages 991 - 1000 | - MITRA; HIGGINS, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 26, pages 85 - 93 | - KAGAYA ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1995), vol. 248, pages 668 - 674 | - XU ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 573 - 588 | - GASSER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 244, page 1293 | - POTRYKUS, BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 535 | - SHIMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, page 274 | - HOOYKAS; SCHILPEROORT, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 19, pages 15 - 38 | - CHRISTOU, PLANT J., (1992), vol. 2, pages 275 - 281 | - SHIMAMOTO, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 5, pages 158 - 162 | - VASIL ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674 | - OMIRULLEH ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 21, pages 415 - 428 | - MARTINEZ ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 553 - 560 | - GUSTAFSSON ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 346 - 353 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1419 - 1422 | - RASMUSSEN ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2006), vol. 94, pages 869 - 876 |