EP2981552 - BISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR FAP AND DR5, ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR DR5 AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 18 8952 Schlieren / CH | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUENKER, Peter Burgwiesenstrasse 3c CH-8335 Hittnau / CH | 02 /
DAOUTI, Sherif 63 Minnisink Road Totowa, New Jersey 07512 / US | 03 /
FENG, Ningping 6 Bayview Court South Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 3E6 / CA | 04 /
FERRARA KOLLER, Claudia Haenibueel 13 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 05 /
GEORGES, Guy Am Berggraben 11 82392 Habach / DE | 06 /
GRAU-RICHARDS, Sandra Breitestrasse 16 CH-8903 Birmensdorf ZH / CH | 07 /
HOSSE, Ralf Schmiedstrasse 8 CH-6330 Cham / CH | 08 /
KLEIN, Christian Chruezacherweg 41 CH-8906 Bonstetten / CH | 09 /
KOENIG, Maximiliane Richard-Strauss-Strasse 5 82049 Pullach / DE | 10 /
MOELLEKEN, Joerg Ossietzystrasse 2 80686 Muenchen / DE | 11 /
MOESSNER, Ekkehard Felsenburgweg 5 CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | 12 /
NIU, Huifeng 2050 Wood Road Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US | 13 /
PACKMAN, Kathryn E. 65 Andrew Street Newton, Massachusetts 02461 / US | 14 /
RUNZA, Valeria Bichler Strasse 3a 82377 Penzberg / DE | 15 /
SEEBER, Stefan Mitterweg 2 82404 Sindelsdorf / DE | 16 /
UMANA, Pablo Felsenrainstrasse 28 CH-8832 Wollerau / CH | 17 /
WALDHAUER, Inja Schlierenstrasse 39 CH-8902 Urdorf / CH | 18 /
WANG, Huisheng 292 Savoy Avenue Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | 19 /
WEISER, Barbara Koenigbergstrasse 51 82404 Sindelsdorf / DE | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Townsend, Carolin F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 14714275.6 | 01.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014EP56511 | Priority number, date | US201361808128P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808128 P | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161845 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981552 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2981552 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/40, C07K16/30, C07K16/46, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K16/2875 (KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39533 (KR);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
C07K2317/62 (KR);
C07K2317/624 (EP,US);
C07K2317/64 (EP,US);
C07K2317/66 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER SPEZIFISCH FÜR FAP UND DR5, SPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER FÜR DR5 UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2016/06] | English: | BISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR FAP AND DR5, ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR DR5 AND METHODS OF USE | [2016/06] | French: | ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUES DIRIGÉS CONTRE FAP ET DR5, ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUES DIRIGÉS CONTRE DR5 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2014 | AL | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | DK | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | IE | 01.04.2019 | LU | 01.04.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.04.2014 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 01.04.2014 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 13.02.2019 | |
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [IDAY]US2007031414 (ADAMS CAMELLIA W [US]); | [IDAY]WO2011039126 (ROCHE GLYCART AG [CH], et al); | [XDAY]WO2012020006 (ROCHE GLYCART AG [CH], et al) | by applicant | US4186567 | US4676980 | WO9305804 | US5202238 | US5204244 | WO9308829 | US5500362 | US5565332 | WO9730087 | US5731168 | US5821337 | WO9858964 | WO9922764 | US5959177 | US5969108 | US6040498 | WO0061739 | US6171586 | WO0129246 | US6267958 | WO0231140 | US6417429 | US6420548 | US2002164328 | WO03011878 | US2003115614 | US6602684 | US2003157108 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | US2004132066 | WO2004065540 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | WO2005100402 | US2005260186 | US6982321 | US2006025576 | WO2006029879 | WO2006044908 | US2006104968 | US7087409 | WO2006083971 | US7125978 | US2007031414 | US7332581 | US2008069820 | EP1922337 | WO2008077546 | US7521541 | US7527791 | WO2009080252 | WO2009080253 | WO2009080251 | WO2009080254 | WO2009089004 | US7695936 | WO2010136172 | WO2010145792 | WO2011039126 | WO2011098520 | WO2012020006 | WO2013026831 | WO2012EP55393 |